Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
27.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.04.2015 [2015/18] |
09.12.2014 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
30.05.2014 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
06.05.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.08.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 05.09.2012 [2012/36] |
29.03.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
09.03.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] |
09.03.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 11.04.2012 [2012/15] |
29.12.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.12.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.01.2011 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
28.12.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
13.12.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |