EP2437772 - IMMUNOREGULATORY PEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.02.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 13Therapeutics, Inc. 2611 SW 3rd Avenue, Suite 200 Portland, OR 97201 / US | [2017/07] |
Former [2012/15] | For all designated states 13therapeutics, Inc. 2611 SW 3rd Avenue, Suite 200 Portland, OR 97201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MCCOY, Sharon, L. 544 NE Floral Place Portland OR 97232 / US | 02 /
HEFENEIDER, Steven, H. 7220 SW Northvale Way Portland OR 97225 / US | [2012/15] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2017/49] | J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2012/15] | Roques, Sarah Elizabeth J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10784168.6 | 04.06.2010 | [2017/49] | WO2010US37443 | Priority number, date | US20090220738P | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 220738 P | US20090184438P | 05.06.2009 Original published format: US 184438 P | US20090256364P | 30.10.2009 Original published format: US 256364 P | US20090220745P | 26.06.2009 Original published format: US 220745 P | US20090184455P | 05.06.2009 Original published format: US 184455 P | [2012/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010141845 | Date: | 09.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/49] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2437772 | Date: | 11.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2437772 | Date: | 06.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 09.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/16, A61K38/02, A61K38/10, C07K14/00, C07K7/08, A61P29/00, A61P17/06, A61P17/00, A61P19/02 | [2012/15] | CPC: |
C07K7/06 (EP,US);
A61K39/285 (US);
A61P1/10 (EP);
A61P1/12 (EP);
A61P1/14 (EP);
A61P11/02 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/04 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/04 (EP);
A61P27/16 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/02 (EP);
A61P37/08 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/005 (EP,US);
C07K14/07 (US);
C07K14/47 (EP,US);
C07K7/08 (EP,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,US);
C07K2319/10 (EP,US);
C12N2710/24122 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/15] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IMMUNREGULIERENDE PEPTIDE UND VERWENDUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/15] | English: | IMMUNOREGULATORY PEPTIDES AND METHODS OF USE | [2012/15] | French: | PEPTIDES IMMUNORÉGULATEURS ET PROCÉDÉS D'UTILISATION | [2012/15] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 15.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/15] | 02.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 23.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.08.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2016 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 08.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 26.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2015 | Opposition(s) | 07.09.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2017 | 08   M06   Fee paid on   27.10.2017 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.06.2010 | AL | 06.12.2017 | AT | 06.12.2017 | CY | 06.12.2017 | CZ | 06.12.2017 | DK | 06.12.2017 | EE | 06.12.2017 | ES | 06.12.2017 | FI | 06.12.2017 | HR | 06.12.2017 | IT | 06.12.2017 | LT | 06.12.2017 | LV | 06.12.2017 | MC | 06.12.2017 | MK | 06.12.2017 | NL | 06.12.2017 | PL | 06.12.2017 | PT | 06.12.2017 | RO | 06.12.2017 | SE | 06.12.2017 | SI | 06.12.2017 | SK | 06.12.2017 | SM | 06.12.2017 | TR | 06.12.2017 | BG | 06.03.2018 | NO | 06.03.2018 | GR | 07.03.2018 | IS | 06.04.2018 | IE | 04.06.2018 | LU | 04.06.2018 | MT | 04.06.2018 | BE | 30.06.2018 | CH | 30.06.2018 | LI | 30.06.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 04.06.2010 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CY | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
MK | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
MT | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 04.06.2010 | |
AT | 06.12.2017 | ||
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PT | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
MT | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
TR | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
MT | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
MT | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
BE | 30.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
CH | 30.06.2018 | ||
LI | 30.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
IE | 04.06.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
LU | 04.06.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
MC | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SI | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
DK | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
RO | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
IT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/38] | AT | 06.12.2017 | |
CZ | 06.12.2017 | ||
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CZ | 06.12.2017 | |
EE | 06.12.2017 | ||
ES | 06.12.2017 | ||
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
PL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
SK | 06.12.2017 | ||
SM | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/34] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
NL | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
LV | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
BG | 06.03.2018 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
HR | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
SE | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | ||
GR | 07.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 06.12.2017 | |
FI | 06.12.2017 | ||
LT | 06.12.2017 | ||
NO | 06.03.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2006009391 (HEFENEIDER STEVEN H [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * whole document esp. paragraphs [20,21,62,72, etc.] *; | [YP]WO2010055500 (TRINITY COLLEGE DUBLIN [IE], et al) [YP] 1-15 * whole document esp. pages 35,45 *; | [Y] - MCCOY SHARON L ET AL, "Identification of a peptide derived from vaccinia virus A52R protein that inhibits cytokine secretion in response to TLR-dependent signaling and reduces in vivo bacterial-induced inflammation", THE JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION OF IMMUNOLOGISTS, US, (20050301), vol. 174, no. 5, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 3006 - 3014, XP002532542 [Y] 1-15 * whole document esp. abstract * | Examination | US2008039395 | by applicant | US7192930 | US2008039395 | - TAKEDA, K.; S. AKIRA., "TLR signaling pathways", SEMINARS IN IMMUNOLOGY, (2004), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/j.smim.2003.10.003, page 3, XP002331805 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.smim.2003.10.003 | - SCHNARE M.; G. M. BARTON; A. C. HOLT; K. TAKEDA; S. AKIRA; R. MEDZHITOV, "Toll-like receptor control activation of adaptive immune responses", NAT. IMMUNO, (2001), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/ni712, page 947, XP001119054 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni712 | - GRANUCCI, F.; C. VIZZARDELLI; N. PAVELKA; S. FEAU; M. PERSICO; E. VIRZI; M. RESCIGNO; G. MORO; P. RICCIARDI-CASTAGNOLI, "Inducible II-2 production by dendritic cells revealed by global gene expression analysis", NAT. IMMUNOL, (2001), vol. 2, doi:doi:10.1038/ni0901-882, page 882, XP009006128 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni0901-882 | - KRIEG, A. M., "CpG motifs in bacterial DNA and their immune effects", ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 20, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.immunol.20.100301.064842, page 709, XP009016455 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.immunol.20.100301.064842 | - TRINCHIERI, G., "Interleukin-12: a cytokine at the interface of inflammation and immunity", ADV. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 70, page 83 | - OZATO, K.; H. TSUJIMURA; T TAMURA, "Toll-like receptor signaling and regulation of cytokine gene expression in the immune system", BIOTECHNIQUES, (200210), page 66, XP001539678 | - YI, A. K.; J. G. YOON; S. J. YEO; S. C. HONG; B. K. ENGLISH; A. M. KRIEG, "Role of mitogen-activated protein kinases in CpG DNA-mediated IL-10 and IL-12 production: central role of extracellular signal-regulated kinase in the negative feedback loop of the CpG DNA-mediated Thl response", J. IMMUNOL., (2002), vol. 168, page 4711 | - FAN, J.; A. B. MALIK, "Toll-like receptor-4(TLR4) signaling augments chemokine-induced neutrophil migration by modulating cell surface expression of chemokine receptors", NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, doi:doi:10.1038/nm832, page 315, XP008137565 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nm832 | - MCCOY, S. L.; S. E. KURTZ; F. A. HAUSMAN; S. R. TRUNE; R. M. BENNETT; S. H. HEFENEIDER, "Activation of RAW264.7 macrophages by bacterial DNA and lipopolysaccharide increases cell surface DNA binding and internalization", J. BIOL. CHEM., (2004), vol. 279, page 17217 | - HOSHINO, K.; O. TAKEUCHI; T. KAWAI; H. SANJO; T. OGAWA; Y. TAKEDA; K. TAKEDA; S. AKIRA, "Cutting Edge: Toll-like receptor 4 (TLR4)-deficient mice are hyproresponsive to lipopolysaccharide: evidence for TLR4 as the Lps gene product", J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 162, page 3749 | - HEMMI, H.; O. TAKEUCHI; T. KAWAI; T. KAISHO; S. SATO; H. SANJO; M. MATSUMO; K. HOSHINO; H. WAGNER; K. TAKEDA, "A Toll-like receptor recognizes bacterial DNA", NATURE, (2000), vol. 408, doi:doi:10.1038/35047123, page 740, XP002221246 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35047123 | - HAYASHI, F.; K. D. SMITH; A. OZINSKY; T. R. HAWN; E. C. YI; D. R. GOODLETT; J. K. ENG; S. AKIRA; D, M. UNDERHILL; A. ADEREM, "The innate immune response to bacterial flagellin is mediated by Toll-like receptor 5", NATURE, (2001), vol. 410, doi:doi:10.1038/35074106, page 1099, XP002210843 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/35074106 | - TAKEDA, K.; T. KAISHO; S. AKIRA, "Toll-like receptors", ANN. REV. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 21, doi:doi:10.1146/annurev.immunol.21.120601.141126, page 335, XP002470283 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1146/annurev.immunol.21.120601.141126 | - AKIRA, S, "Mammalian Toll-like receptors", CURR. OPIN. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 15, doi:doi:10.1016/S0952-7915(02)00013-4, page 5, XP004399365 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0952-7915(02)00013-4 | - BOWIE, A.; E. KISS-TOTH; J. A. SYMONS; G. L. SMITH; S. K. DOWER; L. A. J. O'NEILL, "A46R and A52R from vaccinia virus are antagonists of host IL-1 and toll-like receptor signaling", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2000), vol. 97, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.160027697, page 10162, XP002264055 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.160027697 | - O'NEILL L, "The Toll/interleukin-1 receptor domain: a molecular switch for inflammation and host defence", BIOCHEM. SOC. TRANS., (2000), vol. 28, page 557, XP002264057 | - BELLOWS, C. F.; R. F. GARRY; B. M. JAFFE, "Vaccinia virus-induced inhibition of nitric oxide production", J. SURG. RES, (2003), vol. ILL, page 127 | - HARTE, M. T.; I. R. HAGA; G. MALONEY; P. GRAY; P. C. READING; N. W. BARTLETT; G. L. SMITH; A. BOWIE; L. A. J. O'NEILL, "The poxvirus protein A52R targets Toll-like receptor signaling complexes to suppress host defense", J. EXP. MED., (2003), vol. 197, doi:doi:10.1084/jem.20021652, page 343, XP002264056 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1084/jem.20021652 | - YI, A. K.; A. M. KRIEG, "Cutting Edge: Rapid induction of mitogen-activated protein kinases by immune stimulatory CpG DNA", J. IMMUNOL., (1998), vol. 161, page 4493 | - WENDER, P. A.; D. J. MITCHELL; K. PATTABIRAMAN; E. T. PELKEY; L. STEINMAN, "The design, synthesis, and evaluation of molecules that enable or enhance cellular uptake: Peptoid molecular transporters", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2000), vol. 97, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.97.24.13003, page 13003, XP002347555 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.97.24.13003 | - BARZILAI A.; B. DEKEL; R. DAGAN; E. LEIBOVITZ, "Middle ear effusion II-6 concentration in bacterial and non-bacterial acute otitis media", ACTA PAEDIATR, (2000), vol. 89, page 1068 | - TAKEDA, K.; S. AKIRA, "TLR signaling pathways", SEMIN. IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 16, doi:doi:10.1016/j.smim.2003.10.003, page 3, XP002331805 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.smim.2003.10.003 | - JANSSENS, S.; R. BEYAERT, "Functional diversity and regulation of different interleukin-1 receptor-associated kinase (IRAK) family members", MOL. CELL, (2003), vol. 11, doi:doi:10.1016/S1097-2765(03)00053-4, page 293, XP008110900 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S1097-2765(03)00053-4 | - DAUN, J. M.; M. J. FENTON, "Interleukin-1/Toll receptor family members: receptor structure and signal transduction pathways", J. INTERFERON CYTOKINE RES., (2000), vol. 20, page 843 | - BARTON, G. M.; R. MEDZHITOV, "Linking Toll-like receptors to IFN-a/p expression", NAT. IMMUNOL., (2003), vol. 4, page 432 | - KARASEN R. M.; Y. SUTBEYAZ; B. AKTAN; H. OZDEMIR; C. GUNDOGU, "Effect of web 2170 BS, platelet activating factor receptor inhibitor, in the guinea pig model of middle ear inflammation", ANN OTOL RHINOL LARYNGOL, (2000), vol. 109, page 549 | - DALY, K. A.; L. L. HUNTER; G. S. GIEBINK, "Chronic Otitis Media with Effusion", PEDIATRICS IN REVIEW, (1999), vol. 20, page 85 | - KUBBA H.; J. P. PEARSON; J. P. BIRCHALL, "The aetiology of otitis media with effusion: a review", CLIN OTOLARYNGOL, (2000), vol. 25, page 181 | - O'NEILL, L. A. J., "Therapeutic targeting of Toll-like receptors for inflammatory and infectious diseases", CURR. OPIN. PHARM., (2003), vol. 3, page 396 | - ZUANY-AMORIM, C.; J. HASTEWELL; C. WALKER, "Toll-like receptors as potential therapeutic targets for multiple diseases", NAT. REV. DRUG DISCOV, (2002), vol. 1, doi:doi:10.1038/nrd914, page 797, XP002480890 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nrd914 | - IKEZOE, T.; Y. YANG; D. HEBER; H. TAGUCHI; H. P. KOEFFLER, "PC-SPES: A potent inhibitor of nuclear factor- B rescues mice from lipopolysaccharide-induced septic shock", MOL. PHARMACOL., (2003), vol. 64, page 1521 | - DELGADO, M.; C. ABAD; C. MARTINEZ; M. G. JUARRANZ; J. LECETA; D. GANEA; R. P. GOMARIZ, "PACAP in immunity and inflammation", ANN. N.Y. ACAD. SCI., (2003), vol. 992, page 141 | - BASU, S.; M. J. FENTON, "Toll-like receptors: function and roles in lung disease", AM. J. PHYSIOL. LUNG CELL MOL. PHYSIOL., (2004), vol. 286, page L887 | - KOPP, E.; S. GHOSH, "Inhibition of NF-kappa B by sodium salicylate and aspirin", SCIENCE, (1994), vol. 265, page 956 | - ALMAWI, W. Y.; O. K. MELEMEDJIAN, "Negative regulation of nuclear factor-kappaB activation and function by glucocorticoids", J. MOL. ENDOCRINOL., (2002), vol. 28, doi:doi:10.1677/jme.0.0280069, page 69, XP002542461 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1677/jme.0.0280069 | - ANDREAKOS, E. T.; B. M. FOXWELL; F. M. BRENNAN; R. N. MAINI; M. FELDMANN, "Cytokines and anti-cytokine biologicals in autoimmunity: present and future", CYTOKINE GROWTH FACTOR REV., (2002), vol. 13, page 299 | - MENG, G.; M. RUTZ; M. SCHIEMANN; J. METZGER; A. GRABIEC; R. SCHWANDNER; P. B. LUPPA; F. EBEL; D. H. BUSCH; S. BAUER, "Antagonistic antibody prevents Toll-like receptor 2-driven lethal shock-like syndromes", J. CLIN. INVEST., (2004), vol. 113, doi:doi:10.1172/JCI200420762, page 1473, XP002668418 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1172/JCI200420762 | - SWEET, M. J.; B. P. LEUNG; D. KANG; M. SOGAARD; K. SCHULZ; V. TRAJKOVIC; C. C. CAMPBELL; D. XU; F. Y. LIEW, "A novel pathway regulating lipopolysaccharide-induced shock by ST2/T1 via inhibition of Toll-like receptor 4 expression", J. IMMUNOL., (2001), vol. 166, doi:doi:10.4049/jimmunol.166.11.6633, page 6633, XP009160422 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.166.11.6633 | - BRINT, E. K.; D. XU; H. LIU; A. DUNNE; A. N. MCKENZIE; L. A. O'NEILL; F. Y. LIEW, "ST2 is an inhibitor of interleukin 1 receptor and Toll-like receptor 4 signaling and maintains endotoxin tolerance", NAT. IMMUNOL, (2004), vol. 5, doi:doi:10.1038/ni1050, page 373, XP002995949 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ni1050 | - CHUANG, T. H.; R. J. ULEVITCH, "Triad3A, an E3 ubiquitin-protein ligase regulating Toll-like receptors", NAT. IMMUNOL., (2004), vol. 5, page 495 | - BARTFAI, T.; M. M. BEHRENS; S. GAIDAROVA; J. PEMBERTON; A. SHIVANYUK; J. REBEK, JR., "A low molecular weight mimic of the Toll/IL-1 receptor/resistance domain inhibits IL-1 receptor-mediated responses", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. U.S.A., (2003), vol. 100, doi:doi:10.1073/pnas.0932746100, page 7971, XP002341589 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0932746100 | - MCCOY, S. L.; KURTZ, S. E.; MACARTHUR, C. J.; TRUNE, D. R; HEFENEIDER, S. H., "Identification of a Peptide Derived from Vaccinia Virus A52R Protein That Inhibits Cytokine Secretion in Response to TLR-Dependent Signaling and Reduces In Vivo Bacterial-induced Inflammation", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, (2005), vol. 174, pages 3006 - 3014, XP002532542 |