EP2486431 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING A HYDROPHONE PARAMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.09.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] | Applicant(s) | For:AL
BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | For:FR
Services Petroliers Schlumberger (SPS) 42 rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town, Tortola / VG | For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
RS
SE
SM
Prad Research And Development Limited A British Virgin Islands Company Craigmulr Chambers P.O. Box 71 Road Town, Tortola / VG | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | For:AL
BG
CZ
DE
DK
GR
HU
IE
IT
LT
NO
PL
RO
SI
SK
TR
Schlumberger Technology B.V. Parkstraat 83-89 2514 JG The Hague / NL | ||
For:FR
Services Petroliers Schlumberger (SPS) 42 rue Saint Dominique 75007 Paris / FR | |||
For:GB
NL
Schlumberger Holdings Limited P.O. Box 71 Craigmuir Chambers Road Town Tortola / VG | |||
For:AT
BE
CH
CY
EE
ES
FI
HR
IS
LI
LU
LV
MC
MK
MT
PT
RS
SE
SM
Prad Research And Development Limited A British Virgin Islands Company Craigmulr Chambers P.O. Box 71 Road Town, Tortola / VG | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TULETT, John, Richard 3-16-1 Shinohara Higashi Kohoku-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken 222-0022 / JP | 02 /
WILSON, Colin, A. 1 Collingwood Avenue Tolworth Surrey KT5 9PT / GB | [2012/33] | Representative(s) | Schlumberger Intellectual Property Department Parkstraat 83 2514 JG Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/33] | Fortt, Simon Merton, et al Schlumberger Cambridge Research Ltd IPL High Cross Madingley Road Cambridge, Cambridgeshire CB3 0EL / GB | Application number, filing date | 10784843.4 | 28.10.2010 | WO2010IB02752 | Priority number, date | US20090260841P | 12.11.2009 Original published format: US 260841 P | US20100912745 | 27.10.2010 Original published format: US 912745 | [2012/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011058403 | Date: | 19.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2486431 | Date: | 15.08.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.05.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G01V13/00 | [2012/33] | CPC: |
G01V13/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG EINES HYDROPHONPARAMETERS | [2012/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING A HYDROPHONE PARAMETER | [2012/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL PERMETTANT DE MESURER UN PARAMÈTRE D'HYDROPHONE | [2012/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.05.2012 | Examination requested [2012/33] | 09.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.05.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/41] | 01.06.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2017 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US5712828 (LUSCOMBE JOHN [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,4,5,9,10,14-19 * column 4, line 20 - column 5, line 50 * [I] 3,6-8,11-13,20; | [X]US3659255 (TROTT WINFIELD JAMES) [X] 1-4,9,16 * column 2, line 59 - column 3, line 25; claim 1 *; | [A]US2005257598 (ALCOVERRO BENOIT [FR] ET AL) [A] 1,9,16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0036] - [0041] - [0092] *; | [A]US5448904 (ZUCKERWAR ALLAN J [US] ET AL) [A] 1,9,16 * abstract *; | [A]US5361240 (PEARCE RICHARD E [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US19410612608 |