12.10.2018 |
Refusal of application |
published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] |
05.07.2018 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
28.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
25.06.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
08.06.2018 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
13.04.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
13.04.2018 |
Deletion: Date of oral proceedings |
|
23.03.2018 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
02.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.08.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
01.06.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.04.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
08.04.2016 |
First examination report |
|
30.05.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.04.2015 |
New entry: Observations by third parties |
|
28.02.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
28.11.2014 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
28.11.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] |
03.06.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.06.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.08.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 12.09.2012 [2012/37] |
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.03.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
16.03.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
06.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
19.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.12.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|