Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8979761 | Global Dossier | 17.03.2015 | B2 | US2012078122 | 29.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009137551 | 08.06.2009 | WO2010JP58904 | 26.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5704612B | Global Dossier | 22.04.2015 | B2 | JPWO2010143535 | 22.11.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2011518410 | 26.05.2010 | JP2009137551 | 08.06.2009 | WO2010JP58904 | 26.05.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2441387 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2014 | A4 | EP2441387 | 18.04.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009137551 | 08.06.2009 | WO2010JP58904 | 26.05.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010143535 | Global Dossier | 16.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2009137551 | 08.06.2009 |