EP2441865 - ACRYLONITRILE SWOLLEN YARN FOR CARBON FIBER, PRECURSOR FIBER BUNDLE, FLAME-PROOF FIBER BUNDLE, CARBON FIBER BUNDLE, AND PRODUCTION METHODS THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.12.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8253 / JP | [2014/51] |
Former [2012/16] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 6-41, Konan 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8506 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Hiroshi c/o Otake Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 02 /
SUGIURA, Naoki c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | 03 /
FUJII, Yasuyuki c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 04 /
MATSUMURA, Hiroko c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 05 /
OKUYA, Takahiro c/o Otake Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 06 /
OOKI, Isao c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 07 /
HATA, Masahiro c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | 08 /
WAKABAYASHI, Kouki c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | 09 /
KOGAME, Akiyoshi c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 10 /
SUMIYA, Kazunori c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | 11 /
HATAYAMA, Akito c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co., Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | [2015/01] |
Former [2014/51] | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Hiroshi c/o Otake Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | ||
02 /
SUGIURA, Naoki c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJII, Yasuyuki c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUMURA, Hiroko c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
05 /
OKUYA, Takahiro c/o Otake Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
06 /
OOKI, Isao c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
07 /
HATA, Masahiro c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | |||
08 /
WAKABAYASHI, Kouki c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | |||
09 /
KOGAME, Akiyoshi c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
10 /
SUMIYA, Kazunori c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 20-1, Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
11 /
HATAYAMA, Akito c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co, Ltd. 1-2, Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | |||
Former [2012/16] | 01 /
HASHIMOTO, Hiroshi c/o Otake Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | ||
02 /
SUGIURA, Naoki c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 1-2 Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | |||
03 /
FUJII, Yasuyuki c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
04 /
MATSUMURA, Hiroko c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
05 /
OKUYA, Takahiro c/o Otake Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
06 /
OOKI, Isao c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
07 /
HATA, Masahiro c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 1-2 Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | |||
08 /
WAKABAYASHI, Kouki c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 1-2 Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | |||
09 /
KOGAME, Akiyoshi c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
10 /
SUMIYA, Kazunori c/o Corporate Research Laboratories Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 20-1 Miyukicho Otake-shi Hiroshima 739-0693 / JP | |||
11 /
HATAYAMA, Akito c/o Toyohashi Production Center Mitsubishi Rayon Co. Ltd. 1-2 Ushikawadori 4-chome Toyohashi-shi Aichi 440-8601 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/08] |
Former [2012/16] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastraße 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10786211.2 | 10.06.2010 | WO2010JP59827 | Priority number, date | JP20090139337 | 10.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009139337 | [2012/16] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010143680 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/50] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2441865 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2441865 | Date: | 18.02.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 16.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | D01F6/18, D01F9/22, D01F6/38 | [2013/21] | CPC: |
D01F6/18 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/06 (KR);
D01D5/247 (EP,US);
D01F9/22 (EP,KR,US);
D02J1/22 (KR);
Y10T428/2975 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/16] | D01F6/18, D01F9/22 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ACRYLNITRIL-SCHWELLGARN FÜR KOHLENSTOFFFASERN, VORLÄUFERFASERBÜNDEL, FLAMMENFESTES FASERBÜNDEL, KOHLENSTOFFFASERBÜNDEL UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2012/16] | English: | ACRYLONITRILE SWOLLEN YARN FOR CARBON FIBER, PRECURSOR FIBER BUNDLE, FLAME-PROOF FIBER BUNDLE, CARBON FIBER BUNDLE, AND PRODUCTION METHODS THEREOF | [2012/16] | French: | FIL EN ACRYLONITRILE EXPANSÉ POUR UNE FIBRE DE CARBONE, FAISCEAU DE FIBRES DE PRÉCURSEUR, FAISCEAU DE FIBRES RÉSISTANT À LA FLAMME, FAISCEAU DE FIBRES DE CARBONE, ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE CE FIL | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2011 | Translation filed | 20.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 13.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 19.11.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.06.2010 | AL | 18.02.2015 | AT | 18.02.2015 | BE | 18.02.2015 | BG | 18.02.2015 | CY | 18.02.2015 | CZ | 18.02.2015 | DK | 18.02.2015 | EE | 18.02.2015 | FI | 18.02.2015 | HR | 18.02.2015 | IT | 18.02.2015 | LT | 18.02.2015 | LV | 18.02.2015 | MC | 18.02.2015 | MK | 18.02.2015 | MT | 18.02.2015 | NL | 18.02.2015 | PL | 18.02.2015 | PT | 18.02.2015 | RO | 18.02.2015 | SE | 18.02.2015 | SI | 18.02.2015 | SK | 18.02.2015 | SM | 18.02.2015 | NO | 18.05.2015 | GR | 19.05.2015 | IE | 10.06.2015 | LU | 10.06.2015 | IS | 18.06.2015 | CH | 30.06.2015 | LI | 30.06.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/34] | HU | 10.06.2010 | |
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MK | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PT | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
SM | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 10.06.2010 | |
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MK | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
SM | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 10.06.2010 | |
AT | 18.02.2015 | ||
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
BG | 18.02.2015 | ||
CY | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
SM | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
MT | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
BE | 18.02.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
CH | 30.06.2015 | ||
LI | 30.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IE | 10.06.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SI | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
LU | 10.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
MC | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2016/03] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
IT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
PL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
CZ | 18.02.2015 | ||
DK | 18.02.2015 | ||
EE | 18.02.2015 | ||
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
RO | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
SK | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
LV | 18.02.2015 | ||
NL | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | AT | 18.02.2015 | |
FI | 18.02.2015 | ||
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
IS | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.02.2015 | |
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
GR | 19.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.02.2015 | |
HR | 18.02.2015 | ||
LT | 18.02.2015 | ||
SE | 18.02.2015 | ||
NO | 18.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.02.2015 | |
NO | 18.05.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1016740 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO [JP]) [A] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [A]US5436275 (KAWASAKI SHIRO [JP], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | International search | [A]JP2009046770 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [A]JPH04240220 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [A]JP2005133274 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO) | by applicant | JPH055224 | JPH0491230 | JPH0615722B | JPH11124744 |