Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.03.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
31.01.2014 | Change - applicant | published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
09.12.2013 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.09.2013 | Change - representative | published on 23.10.2013 [2013/43] |
17.06.2013 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
22.03.2013 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
22.03.2013 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
22.03.2013 | Change - classification | published on 24.04.2013 [2013/17] |
17.08.2012 | Change - extension states | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] |
20.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant | |
29.06.2012 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.03.2012 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
16.03.2012 | Request for examination filed | published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
14.02.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
14.01.2012 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
29.12.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
17.12.2010 | PCT data prior to European publication |