EP2440540 - ANTIMICROBIAL POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.05.2014 | Deletion: Date of oral proceedings | 07.05.2014 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts 225 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Boston, MA 02100 / US | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEW, Gregory, N. 8 Crestview Drive South Deerfield MA 01373 / US | 02 /
MADKOUR, Ahmad, E. 16 Old Log Plain Road Leverett MA 01054 / US | 03 /
LIENKAMP, Karen 181 West Street F3 Ware MA 01082 / US | 04 /
MUSANTE, Ashlan, Marie Max Planck Institut fur Polymer Forschung Ackermannweg 10 55128 Mainz / US | [2012/16] | Representative(s) | Aechter, Bernd Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/16] | Aechter, Bernd Ter Meer Steinmeister & Partner GbR Mauerkircherstrasse 45 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10786649.3 | 08.06.2010 | WO2010US37685 | Priority number, date | US20090185035P | 08.06.2009 Original published format: US 185035 P | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2010144386 | Date: | 16.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/50] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2440540 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 26.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D307/06, C07D207/40, C07D491/048, A61P31/04, A01N43/26 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C07D491/048 (EP,US);
C08G61/00 (KR);
A01N43/26 (KR);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07D207/40 (KR);
C07D225/06 (EP,US);
C07D307/06 (KR);
C07D307/24 (EP,US);
C07D333/38 (EP,US);
C07D491/107 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Title | German: | ANTIMIKROBIELLE POLYMERE | [2012/16] | English: | ANTIMICROBIAL POLYMERS | [2012/16] | French: | POLYMÈRES ANTIMICROBIENS | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 14.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 14.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.12.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 11.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 19.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2008251460 (GSTREIN XAVER NORBERT [AT], et al) [Y] 1-11,15 * See claim 1 *; | [Y] - KAREN LIENKAMP ET AL, "Antimicrobial Polymers Prepared by ROMP with Unprecedented Selectivity: A Molecular Construction Kit Approach", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, ACS PUBLICATIONS, US, vol. 130, no. 30, doi:10.1021/JA801662Y, ISSN 0002-7863, (20080730), pages 9836 - 9843, (20080701), XP008148700 [Y] 1-11,15 * See scheme 2; tables 1 to 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja801662y | [A] - MORTELL K H ET AL, "Synthesis of Cell Agglutination Inhibitors by Aqueous Ring-Opening Methathesis Polymerization", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, ACS PUBLICATIONS, US, (19941228), vol. 116, no. 26, doi:10.1021/JA00105A056, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 12053 - 12054, XP002000244 [A] 1-11,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja00105a056 | [A] - KATHLEEN H. MORTELL ET AL, "Recognition Specificity of Neoglycopolymers Prepared by Ring-Opening Metathesis Polymerization", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (19960101), vol. 118, no. 9, doi:10.1021/ja953574q, ISSN 0002-7863, pages 2297 - 2298, XP055037668 [A] 1-11,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja953574q | International search | [A]US2008251460 (GSTREIN XAVER NORBERT [AT], et al); | [X] - LIENKAMP, K. ET AL., "Antimicrobial Polymers Prepared by ROMP with Unprecedented Selectivity: A Molecular Construction Kit Approach", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, (2008), vol. 130, no. 30, pages 9836 - 9843, XP008148700 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ja801662y |