EP2512265 - AFTERTASTE MASKING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.04.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BOM, David, C. 9983 Weatherly Ct. Cincinnati Ohio 45252 / US | 02 /
GRAY, Kimberley 11313 Enyart Road Loveland Ohio 45140 / US | 03 /
POTINENI, Rajesh, Venkata 9252 DeerCross Parkway Apt 3B Cincinnati Ohio 45236 / US | 04 /
VAN OMMEREN, Esther Eaglelaan 173 NL-8241 AS Lelystad / NL | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Global Patents Givaudan International SA Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Givaudan Patents Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dubendorf / CH | Application number, filing date | 10787497.6 | 14.12.2010 | WO2010EP69622 | Priority number, date | US20090286577P | 15.12.2009 Original published format: US 286577 P | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011073187 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2512265 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2512265 | Date: | 04.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/236, A23L1/302, A23L1/304, A23L1/305, A23L2/52, A23L2/56, A23L2/60, A23L1/22 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
A23L2/52 (EP,US);
A23L2/56 (EP,US);
A23L2/60 (EP,US);
A23L27/30 (EP,US);
A23L27/84 (EP,US);
A23L27/86 (EP,US);
A23L33/15 (EP,US);
A23L33/16 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/33 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NACHGESCHMACKSMASKIERUNG | [2012/43] | English: | AFTERTASTE MASKING | [2012/43] | French: | MASQUAGE D'ARRIÈRE-GOÛT | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 19.12.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.04.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.01.2014 | Opposition(s) | 05.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.12.2010 | AL | 04.06.2014 | AT | 04.06.2014 | BE | 04.06.2014 | BG | 04.06.2014 | CY | 04.06.2014 | CZ | 04.06.2014 | DK | 04.06.2014 | EE | 04.06.2014 | ES | 04.06.2014 | FI | 04.06.2014 | HR | 04.06.2014 | IT | 04.06.2014 | LT | 04.06.2014 | LV | 04.06.2014 | MC | 04.06.2014 | MK | 04.06.2014 | MT | 04.06.2014 | PL | 04.06.2014 | RO | 04.06.2014 | RS | 04.06.2014 | SE | 04.06.2014 | SI | 04.06.2014 | SK | 04.06.2014 | SM | 04.06.2014 | TR | 04.06.2014 | NO | 04.09.2014 | GR | 05.09.2014 | IS | 04.10.2014 | PT | 06.10.2014 | IE | 14.12.2014 | LU | 14.12.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MK | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
MT | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 14.12.2010 | |
AT | 04.06.2014 | ||
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
TR | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
BG | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
MC | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
SM | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
IE | 14.12.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SI | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
LU | 14.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
BE | 04.06.2014 | ||
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
DK | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
IT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
IS | 04.10.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
PL | 04.06.2014 | ||
RO | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
PT | 06.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 04.06.2014 | ||
EE | 04.06.2014 | ||
ES | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
SK | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/52] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
RS | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/51] | AT | 04.06.2014 | |
CY | 04.06.2014 | ||
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
HR | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
LV | 04.06.2014 | ||
SE | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
GR | 05.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
FI | 04.06.2014 | ||
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
NO | 04.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 04.06.2014 | |
LT | 04.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 04.06.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US3329508 (LOUIS FREEDMAN, et al) [X] 1-4 * column 1, line 17 - line 32; examples I-V; claim - *; | [X]US2009117256 (KHATIB KHALED A [US], et al) [X] 4 * table 1 *; | [X]US2008107775 (PRAKASH INDRA [US], et al) [X] 4 * paragraphs [0809] , [0814]; example H38 *; | [A]WO2006052231 (TAYLOR MATTHEW F [US]) [A] 1-4 * claim - * | by applicant | US3329508 | US2008107775 |