EP2646801 - DETERMINATION OF SULPHUR DIOXIDE IN A LIQUID [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FOSS Analytical A/S P.O. Box 260 Foss Allé 1 3400 Hilleroed / DK | [2013/41] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THOMSEN, Henrik Karin Nellemoses Vej 6 1TV DK-2500 Valby / DK | [2013/41] | Application number, filing date | 10787733.4 | 30.11.2010 | WO2010EP68483 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012072106 | Date: | 07.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2646801 | Date: | 09.10.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.06.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2646801 | Date: | 03.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.06.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01N21/35, C12G1/04, G01N33/00, G01N33/14 | [2013/41] | CPC: |
G01N21/3504 (EP,US);
G01N21/59 (US);
G01N33/0042 (EP,US);
G01N33/146 (EP,US);
Y02A50/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/41] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG VON SCHWEFELDIOXID IN EINER FLÜSSIGKEIT | [2013/41] | English: | DETERMINATION OF SULPHUR DIOXIDE IN A LIQUID | [2013/41] | French: | DOSAGE DU DIOXYDE DE SOUFRE DANS UN LIQUIDE | [2013/41] | Entry into regional phase | 21.05.2013 | National basic fee paid | 21.05.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.05.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/41] | 11.10.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 23.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 23.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 04.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2010 | AL | 03.09.2014 | BE | 03.09.2014 | BG | 03.09.2014 | CY | 03.09.2014 | CZ | 03.09.2014 | DK | 03.09.2014 | EE | 03.09.2014 | FI | 03.09.2014 | HR | 03.09.2014 | LT | 03.09.2014 | LV | 03.09.2014 | MC | 03.09.2014 | MK | 03.09.2014 | MT | 03.09.2014 | NL | 03.09.2014 | PL | 03.09.2014 | RO | 03.09.2014 | RS | 03.09.2014 | SE | 03.09.2014 | SI | 03.09.2014 | SK | 03.09.2014 | SM | 03.09.2014 | TR | 03.09.2014 | CH | 30.11.2014 | IE | 30.11.2014 | LI | 30.11.2014 | LU | 30.11.2014 | GB | 03.12.2014 | NO | 03.12.2014 | GR | 04.12.2014 | IS | 03.01.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MK | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
GB | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
MT | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
TR | 03.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
GB | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.11.2010 | |
BE | 03.09.2014 | ||
BG | 03.09.2014 | ||
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
GB | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | BG | 03.09.2014 | |
CY | 03.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
GB | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
SM | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
GB | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SI | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
GB | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
GB | 03.12.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
IE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
DK | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
CH | 30.11.2014 | ||
LI | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
MC | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
BE | 30.11.2014 | ||
LU | 30.11.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
PL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
CZ | 03.09.2014 | ||
EE | 03.09.2014 | ||
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
SK | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
IS | 03.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RO | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
NL | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
HR | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
LV | 03.09.2014 | ||
RS | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 03.09.2014 | |
FI | 03.09.2014 | ||
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
GR | 04.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
NO | 03.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 03.09.2014 | |
LT | 03.09.2014 | ||
SE | 03.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 03.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5844123 (MARSH ROBERT ANTHONY [GB], et al) [A] 1-8* figure 3 *; | [A]WO9953312 (BIOFUTURA S R L [IT], et al) [A] 1-8 * claim 5 *; | [A]US2003178323 (FIEDLER ANDREAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraph [0069] - paragraph [0072]; figures 1,3 * * paragraph [0103] - paragraph [0105] *; | [AD]EP1840557 (FOSS ANALYTICAL AS [DK]) [AD] 1-8 * figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO2008025085 (AMCOR LTD [AU], et al) [A] 1-8 * pages 3-4 *; | [A]DE102009013534 (CRINOTEC GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-8 * figures 6a-6c *; | [A] - JIRÍ CMELÍK ET AL, "Determination of free and total sulfur dioxide in wine samples by vapour-generation inductively coupled plasma-optical-emission spectrometry", ANALYTICAL AND BIOANALYTICAL CHEMISTRY, SPRINGER, BERLIN, DE, (20051001), vol. 383, no. 3, doi:DOI:10.1007/S00216-005-3382-2, ISSN 1618-2650, pages 483 - 488, XP019327621 [A] 1-8 * page 485 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s00216-005-3382-2 | [A] - SATO M ET AL, "VARIETAL DIFFERENCES IN THE PHENOLIC CONTENT AND SUPEROXIDE RADICAL SCAVENGING POTENTIAL OF WINES FROM DIFFERENT SOURCES", JOURNAL OF AGRICULTURAL AND FOOD CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN CHEMICAL SOCIETY, US, (19960101), vol. 44, no. 1, doi:DOI:10.1021/JF950190A, ISSN 0021-8561, pages 37 - 41, XP002040576 [A] 1-8 * page 38 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jf950190a | by applicant | EP1308713 | EP1840577 | - Compendium of International Methods of Analysis-OIV, vol. 2 |