03.07.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] |
26.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
19.06.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2020 [2020/30] |
01.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.06.2020 [2020/23] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
17.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2020 [2020/08] |
20.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.01.2020 [2020/04] |
13.12.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.01.2020 [2020/03] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
30.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.10.2019 [2019/40] |
23.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.09.2019 [2019/39] |
16.08.2019 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.09.2019 [2019/38] |
09.08.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2019 [2019/37] |
26.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2019 [2019/35] |
19.07.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2019 [2019/34] |
24.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.06.2019 [2019/26] |
17.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] |
10.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2019 [2019/24] |
03.05.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.06.2019 [2019/23] |
26.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] |
19.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.05.2019 [2019/20] |
07.09.2018 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.10.2018 [2018/41] |
01.09.2018 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
31.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
31.08.2018 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
27.05.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.12.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2016 |
Change - representative |
|
17.06.2016 |
Change - applicant |
published on 20.07.2016 [2016/29] |
23.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.01.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
10.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.10.2014 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.09.2014 |
First examination report |
|
10.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.02.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 20.03.2013 [2013/12] |
16.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
08.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
14.09.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.10.2012 [2012/42] |
12.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
12.06.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
01.07.2011 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 03.08.2011 [2011/31] |
29.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.12.2010 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|