Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102665454B | Global Dossier | 20.04.2016 | B | CN102665454 | 12.09.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | DE102009054553 | 11.12.2009 | WO2010EP07325 | 02.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2509456 | Global Dossier | 10.10.2018 | B1 | EP2509456 | 17.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009054553 | 11.12.2009 | WO2010EP07325 | 02.12.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2509456T | 29.03.2019 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP10790354 | 02.12.2010 | DE102009054553 | 11.12.2009 | WO2010EP07325 | 02.12.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011069616 | Global Dossier | 16.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009054553 | 11.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009054553 | 05.01.2012 | A8 | DE102009054553 | 16.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009054553 | 11.12.2009 |