EP2513251 - FLAME RETARDANT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BASF SE Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38 67056 Ludwigshafen am Rhein / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states BASF SE 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FLECKENSTEIN, Christoph Mittelstraße 21 63579 Freigericht / DE | 02 /
DENECKE, Hartmut Otgartstr. 27 67071 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
BELLIN, Ingo B2, 5 68159 Mannheim / DE | 04 /
KRIHA, Olaf Eichkehle 22 67433 Neustadt / DE | 05 /
SPIES, Patrick Heinigstr. 42a 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
FUCHS, Sabine Verschaffeltstraße 7 68167 Mannheim / DE | 07 /
MASSONNE, Klemens Höhenweg 8 67098 Bad Dürkheim / DE | 08 /
HAHN, Klaus Im Bügen 9 67281 Kirchheim / DE | 09 /
DEGLMANN, Peter Lindenhofstr. 118 68163 Mannheim / DE | 10 /
HOFMANN, Maximilian Max-Joseph-Straße 6 68167 Mannheim / DE | 11 /
KINDLER, Alois Rosenweg 3 67269 Grünstadt / DE | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | BASF IP Association BASF SE G-FLP-C006 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/43] | Rippel, Hans Christoph, et al Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 10790979.8 | 15.12.2010 | WO2010EP69796 | Priority number, date | EP20090179445 | 16.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09179445 | [2012/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011083009 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2513251 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2513251 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C09K21/12, C08J9/00, C08K5/53 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
C09K21/12 (EP,KR,US);
B29B9/12 (EP);
C08J9/0038 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/14 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/20 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/49 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/523 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/53 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/5398 (EP,KR,US);
B29B9/065 (EP);
C08J2325/04 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/5313 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/49, C08L25/06 (US,EP);
C08K5/53, C08L25/00 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FLAMMSCHUTZMITTEL | [2012/43] | English: | FLAME RETARDANT | [2012/43] | French: | AGENT IGNIFUGE | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 16.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 16.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 13.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.11.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2010 | AL | 13.05.2015 | CY | 13.05.2015 | CZ | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | HR | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | MK | 13.05.2015 | MT | 13.05.2015 | RO | 13.05.2015 | RS | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | SM | 13.05.2015 | BG | 13.08.2015 | GR | 14.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | PT | 14.09.2015 | IE | 15.12.2015 | LU | 15.12.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MK | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/45] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
IE | 15.12.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
LU | 15.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 13.05.2015 | |
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 13.05.2015 | |
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | HR | 13.05.2015 | |
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | HR | 13.05.2015 | |
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | Cited in | International search | [XD]DE19741777 (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]) [XD] 10-23 * page 2, lines 1-65 * * page 4, lines 9-51 * * page 13, line 49 - page 15, line 57 * * page 17, lines 6-37; examples 6,11,17 *; | [A]US2006229372 (ONISHI HIDEAKI [JP], et al) [A] 10-22 * paragraphs [0010] - [0017] - [0042] - [0044] - [0076] - [0078] *; | [A]WO9617853 (AKZO NOBEL NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-23 * page 1, lines 1-20 * | [XD] - GRACHEV M K ANFILOV K L BEKKER A R ET AL, "Phosphorylation of 1,4:3,6-dianhydro-D-Mannitol", JOURNAL OF GENERAL CHEMISTRY USSR, CONSULTANTS BUREAU, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19951201), vol. 65, no. 12 Part 1, ISSN 0022-1279, pages 1785 - 1789, XP008135304 [XD] 23 * Verbindungen XII, XVI, XVII and XIX * | [XD] - M. M. DEMAINE, S. J. BENKOVIC, "Kinetic hysteresis for fructose bisphosphatase: A change in substrate configuration specificity", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (19790603), vol. 88, no. 3, pages 835 - 840, XP002631998 [XD] 23 * table 1 * | [XD] - MANFRED T. REETZ, TORSTEN NEUGEBAUER, "New Diphosphite Ligands for Catalytic Asymmetric Hydrogenation: The Crucial Role of Conformationally Enantiomeric Diols", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE INTERNATIONAL EDITION, (19990115), vol. 38, no. 1-2, pages 179 - 181, XP002631999 [XD] 23 * Verbindugen 4a-4g;; table 1 * | [XD] - ELISABETH HAUPTMAN, RAFAEL SHAPIRO, WILLIAM MARSHALL, "Synthesis of Chiral Bis(phosphinite) Ligands with a Tetrahydrothiophene Backbone: Use in Asymmetric Hydrogenation", ORGANOMETALLICS, (19980626), vol. 17, pages 4976 - 4982, XP002632000 [XD] 23 * Verbindungen 6a-6d * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/OM980540T | by applicant | WO2009035881 | WO2008088487 | US5569015 | DE19741777 | EP1791896 | WO03062251 | WO9617853 | WO2006063287 | CA2196632 | CN101544624 | CN101481390 | US4440880 | US4698215 | WO9910429 | - DEMAINE, M. M.; BENKOVIC, S. J., BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, (1979), vol. 88, no. 3, pages 835 - 40 | - GRACHEV, M. K.; ANFILOV, K. L.; BEKKER, A. K.; NIFANT'EV. E. E., ZHURNAL OBSHCHEI KHIMII, (1995), vol. 65, no. 12, pages 1946 - 50 | - PETROV, K. A.; NIFANT'EV, E. E.; SHCHEGLOV, A. A.; KHUDYNTSEV, N. A., ZHURNAL OBSHCHEI KHIMII, (1962), vol. 32, pages 3074 - 80 | - CHEN, MIN-DONG; YUAN, JIAN-CHAO; ZHANG, YU-HUA; LU, SHI-JIE; SUN, WEI; WANG, LAI-LAI., FENZI CUIHUA, (2001), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 385 - 387 | - KUROCHKINA, G. I.; GRACHEV, M. K.; VASYANINA, L. K.; PISKAEV, A. E.; NIFANT'EV, E. F., DOKLADY AKADEMII NAUK, (2000), vol. 371, no. 2, pages 189 - 193 | - REETZ, MANFRED T.; NEUGEBAUER, TORSTEN, ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED., (1999), vol. 38, no. 1/2, pages 179 - 181 | - DIEGUEZ, MONTSERRAT; PAMIES, OSCAR; CLAVER, CARMEN, JOURNAL OFORGANIC CHEMISTRY, (2005), vol. 70, no. 9, pages 3363 - 3368 | - NIFANT'EV, E. E.; TUSEEV, A. P.; KOSHURIN, YU. 1., OTD. OBSHCH. I TEKHN. KHIM., (1965), pages 38 - 41 | - NIFANT'EV, E. E.; MARKOV, S. M.; TUSEEV, A. P.; VASIL'EV, A. F., OTD. OBSHCH. I TEKHN. KHIM., (1965), pages 42 - 5 | - HAUPTMAN, ELISABETH; SHAPIRO, RAFAEL; MARSHALL, WILLIAM, ORGANOMETALLICS, (1998), vol. 17, no. 23, pages 4976 - 4982 | - DHAWAN, BALRAM; REDMORE, DEREK, J. ORG. CHEM., (1986), vol. 51, no. 2, pages 179 - 83 | - KUMAR, K. ANANDA; KASTHURAIAH, M.; REDDY, C. SURESH; NAGARAJU, C, HETEROCYCLIC COMMUNICATIONS, (2003), vol. 9, no. 3, pages 313 - 318 | - GIVELET, CECILE; TINANT, BERNARD; VAN MEERVELT, LUC; BUFFETEAU, THIERRY; MARCHAND-GENESTE, NATHALIE; BIBAL, BRIGITTE, J. ORG. CHEM., (2009), vol. 74, no. 2, pages 652 - 659 | - COTTIER, LOUIS; DESCOTES, GERARD; SORO, YAYA, SYNTH. COMM., (2003), vol. 33, no. 24, pages 4285 - 4295 | - KATRITZKY, ALAN R.; ZHANG, ZHONGXING; LANG, HENGYUAN; JUBRAN, NUSRALLAH; LEICHTER, LOUIS M.; SWEENY, NORMAN, J. HETEROCYCL. CHEM., (1997), vol. 34, no. 2, pages 561 - 565 | - ISHII, AKIHIKO; HORIKAWA, YASUAKI; TAKAKI, LKUO; SHIBATA, JUN; NAKAYAMA, JUZO; HOSHINO, MASAMATSU, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (1991), vol. 32, no. 34, pages 4313 - 16 | - JANG, YONG-SUNG; KIM, HAN-JE; LEE, PHIL-HO; LEE, CHANG-HEE, TETRAHEDRON LETT., (2000), vol. 41, no. 16, pages 2919 - 2923 | - KRAUSS, JUERGEN; UNTERREITMEIER, DORIS; ANTLSPERGER, DOROTHEE, ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE, (2003), vol. 336, no. 8, pages 381 - 384 | - WALBA, D. M.; WAND, M. D.; WILKES, M. C., J. AM. CHEM. SOC., (1979), vol. 101, no. 15, pages 4396 - 4397 | - MORIMOTO, YOSHIKI; KINOSHITA, TAKAMASA; IWAI, TOSHIYUKI, CHIRALITY, (2002), vol. 14, no. 7, pages 578 - 586 | - DONOHOE, TIMOTHY J.; WILLIAMS, OLIVER; CHURCHILL, GWYDIAN H, ANGEW. CHEM. INT. ED., (2008), vol. 47, no. 15, pages 2869 - 2871 | - ABE, MASATO; KUBO, AKINA; YAMAMOTO, SHUHEI; HATOH, YOSHINORI; MURAI, MASATOSHI; HATTORI, YASUNAO; MAKABE, HIDEFUMI; NISHIOKA, TAKA, BIOCHEMISTRY, (2008), vol. 47, no. 23, pages 6260 - 6266 | - KUSZMANN, J.; SOHAR, P., CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH, (1972), vol. 21, no. 1, pages 19 - 27 | - GARRIGUES; BERNARD; PHOSPH, SULFUR AND SILICON, (1990), vol. 53, no. 1-4, pages 75 - 9 | - KUMARESAN, D.; AGARWAL, NEERAJ; GUPTA, ITI; RAVIKANTH, M., TETRAHEDRON, (2002), vol. 58, no. 26, pages 5347 - 5356 | - LUTTRINGHAUS, A.; MERZ, H., ARCHIV DER PHARMAZIE UND BERICHTE DER DEUTSCHEN PHARMAZEUTISCHEN GESELLSCHAFT, (1960), vol. 293, pages 881 - 890 | - BLOCK, ERIC; AHMAD, SALEEM, PHOSPH. SULFUR AND THE RELATED ELEMENTS, (1985), vol. 25, no. 2, pages 139 - 145 | - CAMINADE, ANNE MARIE; EI KHATIB, FAYEZ; BACEIREDO, ANTOINE; KOENIG, MAX, PHOSPHORUS AND SULFUR AND THE RELATED ELEMENTS, (1987), vol. 29, no. 2-4, pages 365 - 7 | - HODGSON, LINDA M.; PLATEL, RACHEL H.; WHITE, ANDREW J. P.; WILLIAMS, CHARLOTTE K., MACROMOLECULES, (2008), vol. 41, no. 22, pages 8603 - 8607 | - FADEICHEVA, A. G.; RUDENKO, L. G.; SKURATOVSKAYA, T. N., METODY POLUCHENIYA KHIMICHESKIKH REAKTIVOV I PREPARATOV, (1969), pages 207 - 9 |