EP2503805 - LOCKING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR PARTIAL FUNCTIONS OF TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.03.2015 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.04.2015 [2015/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Hanling ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2012/39] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/39] | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al VEREENIGDE Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | Application number, filing date | 10791179.4 | 23.03.2010 | WO2010CN71202 | Priority number, date | CN20091252500 | 17.12.2009 Original published format: CN200910252500 | [2012/39] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010148673 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | ZH | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2503805 | Date: | 26.09.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/00, H04M3/436 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
H04M1/663 (EP,US);
H04M1/57 (EP,US);
H04M1/67 (EP,US);
H04W12/082 (EP,US);
H04W12/126 (EP,US);
H04M3/436 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/39] | H04W12/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/39] | Title | German: | SPERRVERFAHREN, -VORRICHTUNG UND -SYSTEM FÜR TEILFUNKTIONEN EINES ENDGERÄTS | [2012/39] | English: | LOCKING METHOD, DEVICE AND SYSTEM FOR PARTIAL FUNCTIONS OF TERMINAL | [2012/39] | French: | PROCÉDÉ, DISPOSITIF ET SYSTÈME DE VERROUILLAGE POUR DES FONCTIONS PARTIELLES DE TERMINAL | [2012/39] | Entry into regional phase | 19.06.2012 | Translation filed | 28.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Search fee paid | 28.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/39] | 28.10.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/17] | 03.12.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2005036899 (ENFORA L P [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,10,12 * paragraph [0027]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0030]; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0032]; figure 4 * [Y] 2,5,8,11; | [X]US2008146211 (MIKAN JEFFREY CLINTON [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,10,12 * paragraph [0011]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0032]; figure 2 * * paragraph [0035]; figure 3 *; | [X]WO2005031544 (DISNEY ENTPR INC [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6,7,9,10,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]EP2076057 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 2,5,8,11 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0035]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0045] - paragraph [0046] * * paragraph [0081] * | International search | [A]CN1265256 (NOKIA TELECOMMUNICATIONS OY [FI]); | [A]CN1774011 (RESEARCH MOTION LTD [CA]); | [A]CN1838699 (TELSDA ZHONGKE ELECTRONIC SHEN [CN]); | [A]CN101415182 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) |