22.06.2018 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.07.2018 [2018/30] |
13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
18.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.09.2017 [2017/38] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
04.12.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.01.2016 [2016/01] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
24.04.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
24.04.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 27.05.2015 [2015/22] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
17.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
16.05.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
09.05.2014 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
07.05.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
07.05.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
21.03.2014 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
28.02.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
28.02.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
22.01.2014 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.10.2013 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
04.10.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
04.10.2013 |
Change - classification |
published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] |
17.04.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
31.08.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
31.08.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
29.06.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.04.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
29.03.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|