Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8744499 | Global Dossier | 03.06.2014 | B2 | US2012258694 | 11.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200910189356 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010CN71953 | 21.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2506544 | Global Dossier | 18.06.2014 | B1 | EP2506544 | 06.11.2013 | A4 | EP2506544 | 03.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200910189356 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010CN71953 | 21.04.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2502090T | 02.10.2014 | T3 | Priority number | Date | CN200910189356 | 24.12.2009 | WO2010CN71953 | 21.04.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010148731 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CN200910189356 | 24.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101795310B | 04.12.2013 | B | CN101795310 | 04.08.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200910189356 | 24.12.2009 |