EP2446474 - GRADIENT COLOR FILTERS FOR SUB-DIFFRACTION LIMIT SENSORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.05.2016 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nokia Technologies Oy Karaportti 3 02610 Espoo / FI | [2015/21] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/18] | For all designated states Nokia Corporation Keilalahdentie 4 02150 Espoo / FI | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOSKINEN, Samu Jarvensivuntie 7 A 3 FI-33100 Tampere / FI | 02 /
KALEVO, Ossi Ketunhanta 1 FI-37800 Toijala / FI | 03 /
RISSA, Tero Siivikkalantie 45 FI-33450 Siivikkala / FI | 04 /
ALAKARHU, Juha Pienkodinkatu 4 A 4 FI-33560 Tampere / FI | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Nokia EPO representatives Nokia Technologies Oy Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | [N/P] |
Former [2015/29] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department Karakaari 7 02610 Espoo / FI | ||
Former [2012/18] | Nokia Corporation Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 407 00045 Nokia Group / FI | Application number, filing date | 10791659.5 | 21.04.2010 | WO2010FI50326 | Priority number, date | US20090456881 | 23.06.2009 Original published format: US 456881 | [2012/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010149833 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2446474 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2446474 | Date: | 15.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | FI | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L27/146, G02F1/1335, G02B5/20, H04N9/04 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
H01L27/14621 (EP,US);
H04N25/13 (EP,US);
G02B5/201 (EP,US);
H01L27/14685 (EP,US);
H04N23/843 (EP,US);
H04N25/611 (EP,US);
H04N25/76 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | H01L27/146 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GRADIENTENFARBFILTER FÜR SENSOREN UNTER DER DIFFRAKTIONSGRENZE | [2012/18] | English: | GRADIENT COLOR FILTERS FOR SUB-DIFFRACTION LIMIT SENSORS | [2012/18] | French: | FILTRES DE COULEUR À GRADIENT POUR CAPTEURS INFÉRIEURS À LA LIMITE DE DIFFRACTION | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 10.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.03.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 04.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 04.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 04.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.04.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.04.2010 | AT | 15.07.2015 | BE | 15.07.2015 | BG | 15.07.2015 | CY | 15.07.2015 | CZ | 15.07.2015 | DK | 15.07.2015 | EE | 15.07.2015 | ES | 15.07.2015 | FI | 15.07.2015 | HR | 15.07.2015 | IS | 15.07.2015 | IT | 15.07.2015 | LT | 15.07.2015 | LV | 15.07.2015 | MC | 15.07.2015 | MK | 15.07.2015 | NL | 15.07.2015 | PL | 15.07.2015 | RO | 15.07.2015 | SE | 15.07.2015 | SI | 15.07.2015 | SK | 15.07.2015 | SM | 15.07.2015 | TR | 15.07.2015 | NO | 15.10.2015 | GR | 16.10.2015 | PT | 16.11.2015 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/32] | HU | 21.04.2010 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.04.2010 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
TR | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.04.2010 | |
AT | 15.07.2015 | ||
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CY | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
MC | 15.07.2015 | ||
MK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
SM | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
NL | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
BE | 15.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SI | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/31] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IS | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
RO | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
SK | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
CZ | 15.07.2015 | ||
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
EE | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
IT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
DK | 15.07.2015 | ||
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 15.07.2015 | |
ES | 15.07.2015 | ||
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 15.07.2015 | |
FI | 15.07.2015 | ||
HR | 15.07.2015 | ||
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
PL | 15.07.2015 | ||
SE | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
PT | 16.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 15.07.2015 | |
LT | 15.07.2015 | ||
LV | 15.07.2015 | ||
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
GR | 16.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 15.07.2015 | |
NO | 15.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 15.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2008082569 (NANOLAMBDA INC [US], et al); | International search | [A]US2004218073 (KALEVO OSSI [FI], et al); | [A]WO2008067472 (HARVARD COLLEGE [US], et al); | [AP]WO2009136989 (ECOLE POLYTECH [CH], et al); |