EP2447115 - CABLE HOLDER FOR MOUNTING ON VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.10.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.11.2013 [2013/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nifco INC. 184-1, Maioka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 244-8522 / JP | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FUKUMOTO, Mitsuru c/o Nifco Inc. 184-1 Maioka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8522 / JP | 02 /
SOMA, Toshiaki c/o Nifco Inc. 184-1 Maioka-cho Totsuka-ku Yokohama-shi Kanagawa 244-8522 / JP | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 91052 Erlangen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Gassner, Wolfgang, et al Dr. Gassner & Partner Marie-Curie-Strasse 1 D-91052 Erlangen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10791934.2 | 26.05.2010 | WO2010JP58930 | Priority number, date | JP20090151046 | 25.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009151046 | [2012/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010150616 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447115 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60R11/02, B60R16/02, H01R13/60, H01R13/72 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
B60R16/0215 (EP,US);
H01R13/60 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | B60R11/02, B60R16/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | KABELHALTER ZUR ANBRINGUNG AN EINEM FAHRZEUG | [2012/18] | English: | CABLE HOLDER FOR MOUNTING ON VEHICLE | [2012/18] | French: | ÉTRIER DE CÂBLE POUR MONTAGE SUR UN VÉHICULE | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 27.12.2011 | Translation filed | 27.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 27.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 27.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/48] | 11.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.05.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1946971 (FORD GLOBAL TECH LLC [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0025] *; | [Y]JP2002134951 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0025] *; | [A]US2009130884 (HOWARD DAMIAN [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0101] * * figure 30 *; | [X]WO2009043367 (TOMTOM INT BV [NL], et al) [X] 1 * page 9, line 26 - page 10, line 19 * * page 4, line 8 - line 13 * * figure 9 *; | [A]DE102005035603 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0029] * | International search | [Y]JPH05327584 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2002134951 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2001142571 (SHARP KK) | by applicant | JP4048820B | JPH05294190 |