EP2448025 - LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Withdrawal of application | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Glass Company, Limited Shin-Marunouchi Building 1-5-1 Marunouchi Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NAKAYAMA, Katsuyoshi c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 02 /
OKADA, Toshihisa c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | 03 /
OSAKI, Yasuko c/o Asahi Glass Company Limited 12-1 Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8405 / JP | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10792148.8 | 23.06.2010 | WO2010JP60685 | Priority number, date | JP20090148577 | 23.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009148577 | [2012/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010150830 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2448025 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/60, H01L33/64 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
H01L33/642 (EP,US);
H01L33/48 (KR);
H01L33/60 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/64 (KR);
H01L2224/45144 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48091 (EP,US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
H01L2924/181 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/45144, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (US,EP);
H01L2924/181, H01L2924/00012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | LICHTEMITTIERENDE VORRICHTUNG | [2012/18] | English: | LIGHT-EMITTING DEVICE | [2012/18] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTROLUMINESCENT | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 29.11.2011 | Translation filed | 30.11.2011 | National basic fee paid | 30.11.2011 | Search fee paid | 30.11.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.11.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.11.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 12.12.2012 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2013/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2001322831 (SUMITOMO METAL ELECTRONICS DEV); | [X]JP2006093486 (KYOCERA CORP); | [Y]JP2006210490 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [Y]JP2008041844 (TOYODA GOSEI KK, et al); | [XP]WO2010021367 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) | by applicant | JP2007067116 | JP2008212591 | JP2009148577 |