EP2447265 - NOVEL THIOPHENE CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVE AND MEDICINAL USE OF SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.12.2013 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.12.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.01.2014 [2014/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sanwa Kagaku Kenkyusho Co., Ltd 35 Higashisotoboricho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMASHITA, Tokuyuki c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 02 /
CHIKAMATSU, Kaori 541, Akasakadai Toyokawa-shi Aichi 441-0204 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI, Naoki c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 04 /
IWAI, Hisakazu c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 05 /
KOGAMI, Masakazu c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 06 /
SAKAIRI, Masao c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 07 /
WATANABE, Nobuhide c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 08 /
FUJIEDA, Hiroki c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 09 /
KATAOKA, Daisuke c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 10 /
MAKINO, Mitsuhiro c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 11 /
KATO, Noriyasu c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 12 /
MIYAZAWA, Toshiyuki c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 13 /
NAGAI, Kazushige c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 14 /
KASUGAI, Nobuyoshi c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 15 /
KATAOKA, Hiroyo c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 16 /
HIRAMATSU, Naoki c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 17 /
TSURUTA, Nobuaki c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 18 /
YAMADA, Yurie 1-57-1-303, Kashima Yodogawa-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 532-0031 / JP | 19 /
MIYOSHI, Mika c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 20 /
MURAKAMI, Sei c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 21 /
GOTO, Izumi c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 22 /
IZUCHI, Tohru c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 23 /
SUZUKI, Kimie c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 24 /
HARADA, Satoko c/o SANWA KAGAKU KENKYUSHO Co. LTD. 35 Higashisotobori-cho Higashi-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 461-8631 / JP | 25 /
LANG, Martin Paul-Eipper-Weg 7 82166 Graefelfing / DE | 26 /
SEIFERT, Hans-Juergen Markus Hirtentaeschelweg 14 81377 Munich / DE | 27 /
WOLF, Kaarina Kristina Johannishoehe 60 82288 Kottgeisering / DE | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10792217.1 | 26.06.2010 | WO2010JP60916 | Priority number, date | JP20090152741 | 26.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009152741 | [2012/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010150899 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447265 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D417/14, A61K31/427, A61K31/433, A61P3/10, A61P9/10, A61P13/12, A61P25/00, A61P27/02, A61P43/00, C07D333/40, C07D409/04 | [2012/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/427 (EP,KR,US);
C07D417/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/433 (EP,US);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES THIOPHEN-CARBOXAMID-DERIVAT UND MEDIZINISCHE VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2012/18] | English: | NOVEL THIOPHENE CARBOXAMIDE DERIVATIVE AND MEDICINAL USE OF SAME | [2012/18] | French: | NOUVEAU DÉRIVÉ DE CARBOXAMIDE DE THIOPHÈNE ET SON UTILISATION MÉDICALE | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 22.12.2011 | Translation filed | 22.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 22.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 28.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/03] | 29.08.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/03] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO2008149382 (ADVINUS THERAPEUTICS PRIVATE L [IN], et al) [AD] 1-15 * claim 1 * | International search | [A]JP2009515997 (TAKEDA SANDIEGO, INC.); | [A]WO2008156174 (TAISHO PHARMA CO LTD [JP], et al); | [A]WO2008104994 (ADVINUS THERAPEUTICS PRIVATE L [IN], et al); | [A]WO2008083238 (METABOLEX INC [US], et al); | [A]WO2006132436 (JAPAN TOBACCO INC [JP], et al); | [A]JPH10324632 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES LTD); | [A]JP2009502948 (E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS & CO.) | by applicant | WO2008149382 | WO2004031179 | - EXPERT OPIN. THER. PATENTS, (2008), vol. 18, pages 759 - 768 |