EP2447267 - CHROMENE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tokuyama Corporation 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi, Yamaguchi 745-0053 / JP | [2012/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAKAHASHI Toshiaki c/o TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi YAMAGUCHI 745-0053 / JP | 02 /
TAKENAKA Junji c/o TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi YAMAGUCHI 745-0053 / JP | 03 /
TERANISHI Kazuhiro c/o TOKUYAMA CORPORATION 1-1 Mikage-cho Shunan-shi YAMAGUCHI 745-0053 / JP | [2012/18] | Representative(s) | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/18] | Adam, Holger Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10792222.1 | 22.06.2010 | WO2010JP60936 | Priority number, date | JP20090150798 | 25.06.2009 Original published format: JP 2009150798 | [2012/18] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010150905 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | JA | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2447267 | Date: | 02.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.10.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07D491/107, C07D493/10, C08K5/151, C08L101/00, C09K9/02, G02B5/23, C08K5/1545 | [2012/47] | CPC: |
C07D491/107 (EP,KR,US);
C07D493/10 (EP,KR,US);
C08K5/1545 (EP,US);
C09D201/02 (EP,US);
C09K9/02 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/23 (EP,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/18] | C07D491/107, C07D493/10, C08K5/151, C08L101/00, C09K9/02, G02B5/23 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/18] | Title | German: | CHROMENVERBINDUNG | [2012/18] | English: | CHROMENE COMPOUND | [2012/18] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE CHROMÈNE | [2012/18] | Entry into regional phase | 23.12.2011 | Translation filed | 23.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 23.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 23.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/18] | 17.05.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 15.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2008054942 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-24 *; | [Y]WO2006110221 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) [Y] 1-9 * claims 1-42 * | International search | [Y]WO0160811 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP], et al); | [Y]WO2005028465 (TOKUYAMA CORP [JP], et al); | [A]WO03044022 (VISION EASE LENS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO03025638 (VISION EASE LENS INC [US], et al); | [A]WO0119813 (TRANSITIONS OPTICAL INC [US]) |