20.09.2019 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 23.10.2019 [2019/43] |
03.08.2019 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
03.06.2019 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
18.12.2018 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
25.07.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.06.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.06.2018 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
23.02.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
09.02.2018 |
First examination report |
|
30.06.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.05.2017 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
30.09.2016 |
Change - classification |
published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
30.09.2016 |
Change - date of supplementary search report |
published on 02.11.2016 [2016/44] |
01.07.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.07.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.07.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
31.08.2012 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] |
03.07.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
30.03.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
30.03.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 02.05.2012 [2012/18] |
15.02.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.01.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.06.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|