Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2012076671 | Global Dossier | 29.03.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201013375695 | 02.06.2010 | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10054122 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2018 | B2 | US2015345495 | 03.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113375695 | 01.12.2011 | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | US201514820630 | 07.08.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101699107B | Global Dossier | 23.01.2017 | B1 | KR20120030523 | 28.03.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5689120B | Global Dossier | 25.03.2015 | B2 | JP2012531553 | 10.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN105545740B | Global Dossier | 16.03.2018 | B | CN105545740 | 04.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | CN201080028873 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102459907B | Global Dossier | 25.11.2015 | B | CN102459907 | 16.05.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2766385 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2016 | C | CA2766385 | 29.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2010263161B | Global Dossier | 18.07.2013 | B2 | AU2010263161 | 19.01.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2446145 | Global Dossier | 02.11.2016 | A4 | EP2446145 | 02.05.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI1015937 | 26.09.2017 | A8 | BRPI1015937 | 27.09.2016 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201109336 | 31.08.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | WO2010US37080 | 02.06.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2010151405 | Global Dossier | 29.12.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI567300B | 21.01.2017 | B | TW201104076 | 01.02.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US22090409 | 26.06.2009 |