EP2440577 - TRUNCATED ACTRIIB-FC FUSION PROTEINS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2017 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.05.2017 [2017/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acceleron Pharma, Inc. 128 Sidney Street Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2012/16] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SEEHRA, Jasbir 3 Lincoln Terrace Lexington, MA 02421-6818 / US | 02 /
KUMAR, Ravindra 421 Arlington Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | [2012/23] |
Former [2012/16] | 01 /
SEEHRA, Jasbir 3 Lincoln Terrace Lexington, MA 02421-6818 / US | ||
02 /
KUMAR, Ravindra 421 Arlington Street Acton, MA 01720 / US | Representative(s) | Evenson, Jane Harriet Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/25] | Evenson, Jane Harriet Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | ||
Former [2012/16] | Zvesper, Thomas Mathys & Squire LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2SQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10792510.9 | 08.06.2010 | WO2010US37787 | Priority number, date | US20090268420P | 12.06.2009 Original published format: US 268420 P | US20090280543P | 03.11.2009 Original published format: US 280543 P | [2012/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2010151426 | Date: | 29.12.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2440577 | Date: | 18.04.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2010 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 29.12.2010 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705, A61K38/17, A61P3/00 | [2012/16] | CPC: |
C12N9/12 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
C12N15/62 (KR);
C07K14/71 (EP,CN,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/00 (EP,CN,IL,US);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61P1/16 (EP,IL);
A61P11/00 (EP,IL);
A61P15/10 (EP,IL);
A61P17/02 (EP,IL);
A61P19/02 (EP,IL);
A61P19/10 (EP,IL);
A61P21/00 (EP,IL);
A61P21/02 (EP,IL);
A61P21/04 (EP,IL);
A61P25/28 (EP,IL);
A61P29/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/00 (EP,IL);
A61P3/02 (EP,IL);
A61P3/04 (EP,IL);
A61P3/06 (EP,IL);
A61P3/08 (EP,IL);
A61P3/10 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
A61P43/00 (EP,IL);
A61P5/26 (EP,IL);
A61P5/50 (EP,IL);
A61P9/10 (EP,IL);
A61P9/12 (EP,IL);
C07H21/04 (EP,IL,US);
C07K14/475 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K14/705 (KR);
C12N5/0682 (CN);
C12Y207/1103 (EP,CN,IL,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/16] | Extension states | BA | 12.01.2012 | ME | 12.01.2012 | RS | 12.01.2012 | Title | German: | VERKÜRZTE ACTRIIB-FC-FUSIONSPROTEINE | [2012/16] | English: | TRUNCATED ACTRIIB-FC FUSION PROTEINS | [2012/16] | French: | PROTÉINES DE FUSION ACTRIIB-FC TRONQUÉES | [2012/16] | Entry into regional phase | 12.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 12.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/16] | 05.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2017 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2017/21] | 18.04.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.05.2017 | 09.05.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP17166621.7 / EP3290439 | EP20193499.9 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.04.2014 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 22.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.07.2016 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.01.2015 | Request for further processing filed | 22.01.2015 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.01.2015 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 05.11.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 05.11.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 14.11.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]WO2010019261 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [XP] 1-44 * sequences 2, 5, 28, 30 *; | [E]WO2010083034 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [E] 1-11,13-44 * sequence 5 * * example 1 * * sequence 23 *; | [E]WO2011020045 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al) [E] 1-44* sequences 1, 35 * | International search | [X]US2001039036 (MATHEWS LAWRENCE S [US], et al); | [X]WO2006012627 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2006020884 (WYETH CORP [US], et al); | [X]WO2008076437 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2008097541 (ACCELERON PHARMA INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2008109167 (AMGEN INC [US], et al); | [X]WO2008151078 (WYETH CORP [US], et al); | [XP]US2010068215 (SEEHRA JASBIR [US], et al); | [E]US2010183624 (SEEHRA JASBIR [US], et al); | [XP] - SAKO D. ET AL., "Characterization of the Ligand Binding Functionality of the Extracellular Domain of Activin Receptor Type IIB", THE JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (201004), vol. 285, no. 27, pages 21037 - 21048, XP008148640 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M110.114959 | [XP] - CADENA S.M. ET AL., "Administration of a Soluble Activin Type IIB Receptor Promotes Skeletal Muscle Growth Independent of Fiber Type", JOURNAL OF APPLIED PHYSIOLOGY, (201005), pages 1 - 25, XP008148636 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1152/japplphysiol.00866.2009 |