EP2516012 - BLEACHING COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.08.2014 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Germany GmbH Pfungstädter Strasse 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHÄFER, Sabine Nahestr. 3 65428 Rüsselsheim / DE | 02 /
HULLMANN, Alexandra Brückengarten 1 63329 Egelsbach / DE | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Grit, Mustafa Kao Germany GmbH Pfungstädterstrasse 92-100 64297 Darmstadt / DE | [2012/44] | Application number, filing date | 10792843.4 | 15.12.2010 | WO2010EP07676 | Priority number, date | EP20090015838 | 22.12.2009 Original published format: EP 09015838 | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011076360 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2516012 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2516012 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61Q5/08, A61K8/23, A61K8/73 | [2012/44] | CPC: |
A61K8/23 (EP,US);
A61K8/22 (US);
A61K8/731 (EP,US);
A61Q5/08 (EP,US);
A61K2800/31 (EP,US);
A61K2800/5426 (EP,US);
A61K2800/88 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BLEICHZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2012/44] | English: | BLEACHING COMPOSITION | [2012/44] | French: | COMPOSITION DE DÉCOLORATION | [2013/25] |
Former [2012/44] | COMPOSITION DE BLANCHIMENT | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 28.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 03.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.07.2013 | Opposition(s) | 17.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2010 | AL | 16.10.2013 | AT | 16.10.2013 | BE | 16.10.2013 | BG | 16.10.2013 | CY | 16.10.2013 | CZ | 16.10.2013 | DK | 16.10.2013 | EE | 16.10.2013 | ES | 16.10.2013 | FI | 16.10.2013 | HR | 16.10.2013 | IT | 16.10.2013 | LT | 16.10.2013 | LV | 16.10.2013 | MC | 16.10.2013 | MK | 16.10.2013 | MT | 16.10.2013 | NL | 16.10.2013 | PL | 16.10.2013 | RO | 16.10.2013 | RS | 16.10.2013 | SE | 16.10.2013 | SI | 16.10.2013 | SK | 16.10.2013 | SM | 16.10.2013 | TR | 16.10.2013 | IE | 15.12.2013 | LU | 15.12.2013 | NO | 16.01.2014 | GR | 17.01.2014 | IS | 16.02.2014 | PT | 17.02.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
TR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
GR | 17.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
MT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
GR | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AT | 16.10.2013 | ||
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
BG | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
MK | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
SM | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
MC | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SI | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
IE | 15.12.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
DK | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/38] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
IT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
PL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RO | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
SK | 16.10.2013 | ||
LU | 15.12.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
EE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
PT | 17.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
CY | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
LV | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 16.10.2013 | |
BE | 16.10.2013 | ||
ES | 16.10.2013 | ||
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
RS | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 16.10.2013 | |
FI | 16.10.2013 | ||
HR | 16.10.2013 | ||
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
IS | 16.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 16.10.2013 | |
LT | 16.10.2013 | ||
NL | 16.10.2013 | ||
SE | 16.10.2013 | ||
NO | 16.01.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 16.10.2013 | |
NO | 16.01.2014 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2006099163 (PROCTER & GAMBLE [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1880706 (WELLA AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0022] - paragraph [0024] * * examples 1,6 *; | [A]EP2022482 (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]EP2022469 (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0027] * * example 4 *; | [A]EP2022480 (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0005] , [0013] * * examples 1,7,10-12 *; | [A]EP2055296 (KPSS KAO GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-15 * the whole document * * examples 1,3 *; | [A] - "SOFTCAT SL CONDITIONING POLYMERS", INTERNET CITATION, (20041231), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.in-cosmetics.com/ExhibitorLibrary/234/SoftCAT_SL.pdf, (20060629), XP002387806 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | [A] - "SOFTCAT SX CONDITIONING POLYMERS", INTERNET CITATION, (20070430), pages 1 - 4, URL: http://www.dow.com/PublishedLiterature/dh_0067/0901b80380067b64.pdf?filepath=amerchol/pdfs/noreg/324-00265.pdf&fromPage=GetDoc, (20100705), XP002590456 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0560088 | EP0609796 | EP0640643 | WO9515144 | EP0778020 | WO2005065632 | - K. SCHRADER; A. DOMSCH, Cosmetology - Theory and Practice, VERLAG FUR CHEMISCHE INDUSTRIE, (2005), pages 142 - 151 |