EP2450491 - AUTOMATIC SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Kohler Electronics, Ltd. Buidling E 18 Jindian Road Jinqiao Export Processing Zone Pudong New Area Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2012/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Zhongmin Building E 18 Jindian Road Jinqiao Export Processing Zone Pudong New Area Shanghai 201206 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Pengcheng Building E 18 Jindian Road Jinqiao Export Processing Zone Pudong New Area Shanghai 201206 / CN | 03 /
XIONG, Dehua Building E 18 Jindian Road Jinqiao Export Processing Zone Pudong New Area Shanghai 201206 / CN | [2012/19] | Representative(s) | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham West Midlands B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Wightman, David Alexander Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 10793570.2 | 22.06.2010 | WO2010CN74216 | Priority number, date | CN2009154199 | 30.06.2009 Original published format: CN200910054199 | [2012/19] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011000275 | Date: | 06.01.2011 | Language: | ZH | [2011/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2450491 | Date: | 09.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 06.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2012 | Classification | IPC: | E03C1/00, E03D1/00, G01S17/02, E03C1/05, H03K17/94 | [2012/51] | CPC: |
E03C1/057 (EP,US);
E03D13/00 (US);
G01S17/04 (EP,US);
G01S17/88 (EP,US);
G01S7/4868 (EP,US);
H03K17/941 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/19] | E03C1/00, E03D1/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/19] | Title | German: | AUTOMATISCHES ABTASTSYSTEM UND -VERFAHREN | [2012/19] | English: | AUTOMATIC SENSING SYSTEM AND METHOD | [2012/19] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'INDUCTION AUTOMATIQUE | [2012/19] | Entry into regional phase | 24.01.2012 | Translation filed | 24.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 24.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 24.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/19] | 15.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/51] | 23.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2013/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US5224685 (CHIANG SING [TW], et al); | [X]US5819336 (GILLIAM DANNY W [US], et al); | [A]US2002104159 (NISHIOKA AKIRA [JP]); | [A]US2006124883 (BAILEY ROBERT W [CA]); | [A]US2007057215 (PARSONS NATAN E [US], et al); | [X]US2008100185 (LEWIS RICHARD P [US]) | International search | [A]JPH09195336 (MITSUBISHI RAYON CO); | [Y]US5772291 (BYRD DANNIE D [US], et al); | [A]JP2005098890 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD); | [Y]CN1796674 (MASCO CANADA LTD [CA]); | [A]US2006237674 (IOTT JEFFREY [US], et al) |