EP2516393 - CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS CALPAIN INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/44] | CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS CALPAIN INHIBITORS | ||
[2014/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 10.05.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AbbVie Deutschland GmbH & Co KG Max-Planck-Ring 2a 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | For all designated states AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/24] | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
For all designated states AbbVie Inc. 1 North Waukegan Road North Chicago, IL 60064 / US | |||
Former [2012/44] | For all designated states Abbott GmbH & Co. KG Max-Planck-Ring 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
For all designated states Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Rd. Abbott Park, IL 60064 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLING, Andreas c/o Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 02 /
JANTOS, Katja c/o Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 03 /
MACK, Helmut c/o Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 04 /
MÖLLER, Achim c/o Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 05 /
HORNBERGER, Wilfried c/o Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 06 /
BACKFISCH, Gisela c/o Abbott GmbH&Co. KG Knollstr. 50 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | 07 /
LAO, Yanbin c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park Illinois 60064-6050 / US | 08 /
NIJSEN, Marjoleen c/o Abbott Laboratories 100 Abbott Park Road Abbott Park Illinois 60064-6050 / US | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Reitstötter Kinzebach Patentanwälte Im Zollhof 1 67061 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2012/44] | Reitstötter - Kinzebach Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4 67059 Ludwigshafen / DE | Application number, filing date | 10795007.3 | 21.12.2010 | WO2010EP70418 | Priority number, date | US20090288935P | 22.12.2009 Original published format: US 288935 P | US20100410414P | 05.11.2010 Original published format: US 410414 P | [2012/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011076811 | Date: | 30.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2516393 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2516393 | Date: | 29.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07D207/28, C07D401/04, C07D401/14, A61K31/4015, A61K31/4439, A61P25/28, A61P27/08, A61P35/00, A61P13/12, A61P31/00, A61P31/18, A61P25/00, A61P9/00, A61P21/00 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
C07D401/04 (EP,KR,US);
C07D401/14 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4155 (KR);
A61K31/4439 (KR);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P21/00 (EP);
A61P21/02 (EP);
A61P25/00 (EP);
A61P25/08 (EP);
A61P25/14 (EP);
A61P25/16 (EP);
A61P25/28 (EP);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/08 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P31/18 (EP);
A61P33/02 (EP);
A61P33/06 (EP);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | C07D207/28, C07D401/04, C07D401/14, C07D417/14, A61K31/4015, A61K31/4439, A61P25/28, A61P27/08, A61P35/00, A61P13/12, A61P31/00, A61P31/18, A61P25/00, A61P9/00, A61P21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CARBOXAMID VERBINDUNGEN UND DEREN VERWENDUNG ALS CALPAIN-INHIBITOREN | [2014/44] | English: | CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS CALPAIN INHIBITORS | [2014/44] | French: | COMPOSÉS CARBOXAMIDES ET LEUR UTILISATION COMME INHIBITEURS DE CALPAIN | [2014/44] |
Former [2012/44] | CARBOXAMIDVERBINDUNGEN UND IHRE VERWENDUNG ALS CALPAIN-HEMMER | ||
Former [2012/44] | CARBOXAMIDE COMPOUNDS AND THEIR USE AS CALPAIN INHIBITORS | ||
Former [2012/44] | COMPOSÉS DE CARBOXAMIDE ET LEUR UTILISATION EN TANT QU'INHIBITEURS DE CALPAÏNE | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.10.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 18.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 10.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.04.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.10.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.09.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 18.09.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.09.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.04.2013 | Opposition(s) | 30.07.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2010 | AL | 29.10.2014 | AT | 29.10.2014 | BG | 29.10.2014 | CY | 29.10.2014 | CZ | 29.10.2014 | DK | 29.10.2014 | EE | 29.10.2014 | FI | 29.10.2014 | HR | 29.10.2014 | LT | 29.10.2014 | LV | 29.10.2014 | MC | 29.10.2014 | MK | 29.10.2014 | MT | 29.10.2014 | NL | 29.10.2014 | PL | 29.10.2014 | RO | 29.10.2014 | RS | 29.10.2014 | SE | 29.10.2014 | SI | 29.10.2014 | SK | 29.10.2014 | SM | 29.10.2014 | TR | 29.10.2014 | IE | 21.12.2014 | LU | 21.12.2014 | BE | 31.12.2014 | CH | 31.12.2014 | LI | 31.12.2014 | NO | 29.01.2015 | GR | 30.01.2015 | IS | 28.02.2015 | PT | 02.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MK | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
MT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
TR | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/32] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
AT | 29.10.2014 | ||
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
BG | 29.10.2014 | ||
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/27] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
MC | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
SM | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SI | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
CH | 31.12.2014 | ||
LI | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
IE | 21.12.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
SK | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
CZ | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RO | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
DK | 29.10.2014 | ||
EE | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
LU | 21.12.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
BE | 31.12.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
CY | 29.10.2014 | ||
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 29.10.2014 | |
FI | 29.10.2014 | ||
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
HR | 29.10.2014 | ||
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
LV | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
PL | 29.10.2014 | ||
RS | 29.10.2014 | ||
SE | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
GR | 30.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 29.10.2014 | |
LT | 29.10.2014 | ||
NL | 29.10.2014 | ||
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
IS | 28.02.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
PT | 02.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 29.10.2014 | |
NO | 29.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 29.10.2014 | Cited in | International search | [ID]WO2008080969 (ABBOTT GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [IP]WO2010094755 (ABBOTT GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al); | [IP]WO2010128102 (ABBOTT GMBH & CO KG [DE], et al) | by applicant | WO8800468 | US4826835 | WO9816512 | WO9825883 | WO9825899 | WO9917775 | WO9954294 | WO9954320 | WO9954310 | WO9954304 | WO9954305 | WO9961423 | WO03080182 | WO2007016589 | WO2008080969 | WO2008106130 |