EP2515963 - DIALYSIS MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR PERITONEAL DIALYSIS MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.09.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.02.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2012/44] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HEDMANN, Frank In den Böden 52 97332 Volkach / DE | 02 /
SEBESTA, Sven Ludwigstrasse 17 97421 Schweinfurt / DE | [2012/44] | Representative(s) | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2024/07] |
Former [2012/44] | Laufhütte, Dieter, et al Lorenz-Seidler-Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10795244.2 | 14.12.2010 | [2024/07] | WO2010EP07631 | Priority number, date | DE20091060330 | 23.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009060330 | [2012/44] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011079907 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2515963 | Date: | 31.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/44] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2515963 | Date: | 14.02.2024 | Language: | DE | [2024/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/16, A61M1/28, A61M1/14 | [2023/40] | CPC: |
A61M1/1656 (EP,US);
A61M1/1524 (EP,US);
A61M1/153 (EP,US);
A61M1/1565 (EP,US);
A61M1/159 (EP,US);
A61M1/1617 (EP);
A61M1/166 (EP,US);
A61M1/1668 (EP,US);
A61M1/167 (EP,US);
A61M1/282 (EP,US);
A61M1/287 (EP,US);
A61J1/2093 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/44] | A61M1/16, A61M1/28, A61J1/20 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/44] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DIALYSEMASCHINE, INSBESONDERE PERITONEALDIALYSEMASCHINE | [2012/44] | English: | DIALYSIS MACHINE, IN PARTICULAR PERITONEAL DIALYSIS MACHINE | [2012/44] | French: | MACHINE DE DIALYSE, EN PARTICULIER MACHINE DE DIALYSE PÉRITONÉALE | [2012/44] | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 23.04.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/44] | 08.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.02.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.09.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.10.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.02.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 26.09.2023 | 15.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.09.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 05.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 17.02.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 16.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 20.12.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 19.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BG | 14.02.2024 | ES | 14.02.2024 | FI | 14.02.2024 | HR | 14.02.2024 | LT | 14.02.2024 | LV | 14.02.2024 | NL | 14.02.2024 | PL | 14.02.2024 | SE | 14.02.2024 | NO | 14.05.2024 | RS | 14.05.2024 | GR | 15.05.2024 | IS | 14.06.2024 | PT | 14.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
LV | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
PL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
PT | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
ES | 14.02.2024 | ||
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 14.02.2024 | |
FI | 14.02.2024 | ||
HR | 14.02.2024 | ||
LT | 14.02.2024 | ||
NL | 14.02.2024 | ||
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
RS | 14.05.2024 | ||
GR | 15.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 14.02.2024 | |
NO | 14.05.2024 | ||
IS | 14.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 14.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2099391 (ANPROSOL INC) [A] 18 * abstract *; | [X]WO9309820 (GAMBRO AB [SE]) [X] 18 * page 3, paragraph 3 - page 4, paragraph 2 * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB2362843 (KUO HSIN HO & FED MEDICAL CO L [TW]) [A] 15-17,21 * page 3 * * figure 1 *; | [A]EP1669051 (NIPRO CORP [JP]) [A] 18* abstract *; | [A]WO2007144427 (LDIAMON AS [EE], et al) [A] 15-17,21 * page 1, lines 30-36 * * page 2, lines 7-29 * * page 5, lines 7-13 * * page 6, lines 12-22 * * page 9, lines 14-34 * * page 15, lines 30-35 * * page 18, line 34 - page 19, line 3 * * page 21, lines 16-19 * * figure 1 *; | [XY]WO2008106452 (DEKA PRODUCTS LP [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,19,20 * page 7, lines 8-30 * * page 11, lines 28-32 * * page 12, lines 9-32 * * page 20, lines 12-33 * [Y] 4,9,10,13,14; | [X]US2009009179 (SOBUE KATSUYOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5,9,11,19,20 * figures 2,4A,4B * * paragraphs [0004] - [0007] - [0010] - [0017] - [0044] - [0051] *; | [X]WO2009006471 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [X] 1-3,6,19,20 * paragraph [0298] - paragraph [0310] * * figure 35 *; | [X]US2009012452 (SLEPICKA JAMES S [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,6 * paragraphs [0010] , [0036] - [0041] - [0047] - [0052] - [0076] *; | [YA]WO2009108405 (BAXTER INT [US], et al) [Y] 4,9,10,13,14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0023] , [0024] , [0028] , [0029] , [0030] , [0033] * * figure 3 * [A] 19 |