08.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] |
02.08.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] |
26.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] |
19.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] |
12.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
05.07.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] |
12.01.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.02.2024 [2024/07] |
05.01.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
05.01.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.01.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
19.12.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.09.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
01.09.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
01.09.2023 |
Change - classification |
published on 04.10.2023 [2023/40] |
30.08.2023 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
20.03.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
21.12.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.12.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.12.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2019 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
15.02.2019 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
02.01.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.01.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.10.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
12.07.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.01.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
07.09.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
07.09.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
31.03.2015 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.02.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.02.2015 |
First examination report |
|
06.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.03.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.04.2013 [2013/14] |
11.01.2013 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
14.12.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.09.2012 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
28.09.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
21.05.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
22.07.2011 |
Change - PCT data |
published on 24.08.2011 [2011/34] |
19.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.07.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.01.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|