Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5740412B | Global Dossier | 24.06.2015 | B2 | JP2013515520 | 09.05.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP07631 | 14.12.2010 | DE102009060330 | 23.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102802693B | Global Dossier | 10.06.2015 | B | CN102802693 | 28.11.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP07631 | 14.12.2010 | DE102009060330 | 23.12.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2515963 | Global Dossier | 14.02.2024 | B1 | EP2515963 | 31.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP07631 | 14.12.2010 | DE102009060330 | 23.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011079907 | Global Dossier | 07.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009060330 | 23.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8673139 | Global Dossier | 18.03.2014 | B2 | US2011186517 | 04.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009060330 | 23.12.2009 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE102009060330 | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE102009060330 | 23.12.2009 |