Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2556607
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
14.07.2017 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 16.08.2017 [2017/33] |
10.04.2017 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
16.12.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
11.11.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.11.2016 |
First examination report |
|
14.12.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.12.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
17.12.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2013 |
Change - extension states |
published on 17.07.2013 [2013/29] |
11.01.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
11.01.2013 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] |
27.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
09.11.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
23.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.10.2012 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.10.2011 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|