EP2512697 - METHOD FOR REMOVING EXCESS ADHESIVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.04.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eftec Europe Holding AG Poststrasse 6 6301 Zug / CH | [2018/18] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states Eftec Europe Holding AG Grafenauweg 8 6304 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STRAUSS, Kurt Untere Str. 12 72218 Wildberg / DE | 02 /
SCHWEINFURTH, Michael Pforzheimer Str. 85 71292 Friolzheim / DE | 03 /
MÜLLER, Martin Klufternerstraße 73 88048 Friedrichshafen / DE | 04 /
WANNER, Reiner Alte Poststrasse 48 88690 Uhldingen-Mühlhofen / DE | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Hepp Wenger Ryffel AG Friedtalweg 5 9500 Wil / CH | [2012/43] | Application number, filing date | 10795321.8 | 15.12.2010 | [2018/22] | WO2010EP69818 | Priority number, date | DE20091058337 | 15.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009058337 | DE20101024591 | 22.06.2010 Original published format: DE102010024591 | [2012/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011083012 | Date: | 14.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/28] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2512697 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2512697 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | DE | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B08B5/04, B25J11/00, B25J15/00, B25J17/02, C09J5/00 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
C09J5/00 (EP);
B08B5/04 (EP);
B25J11/00 (EP);
B25J15/0019 (EP);
B25J17/0208 (EP);
B08B2220/01 (EP);
F16B11/006 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | B08B5/04, F16B11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON ÜBERSCHÜSSIGEM KLEBSTOFF | [2012/43] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING EXCESS ADHESIVE | [2012/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ENLÈVEMENT D'ADHÉSIF SUPERFLU | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 30.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.07.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2018 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 22.03.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.04.2018 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 17.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.03.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 01.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 15.12.2010 | AL | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | IT | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | MT | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | RS | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | AT | 15.12.2018 | IE | 15.12.2018 | LU | 15.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | CH | 31.12.2018 | LI | 31.12.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MK | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/30] | HU | 15.12.2010 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/23] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
AT | 15.12.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
CH | 31.12.2018 | ||
LI | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
IE | 15.12.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
LU | 15.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
RS | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 30.05.2018 | |
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Cited in | International search | [XI]EP1977836 (THYSSENKRUPP DRAUZ NOTHELFER [DE]) [X] 1-6,12-15 * abstract * * paragraph [0005] - paragraph [0012]; claims 1-3,5,12,13 * [I] 7-11; | [XP]WO2010075894 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [XP] 1,5,6* page 14, line 18 - line 25; claims 24,25,31 * |