EP2512492 - METHODS OF INHIBITING CATARACTS AND PRESBYOPIA [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 26.04.2019 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.04.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 29.05.2019 [2019/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Massachusetts 225 Franklin Street Boston, MA 02110 / US | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUTHUKUMAR, Murugappan 23 Weaver Circle Amherst Massachusetts 01002 / US | 02 /
OU, Zhaoyang 1208 Harris Road Webster New York 14580 / US | 03 /
CIVAY, Deniz 29B Buffam Rd. Pelham Massachusetts 01002 / US | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Verriest, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2014/11] |
Former [2012/43] | Maureau, Philippe, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau 12, rue Boileau B.P. 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 10795541.1 | 13.12.2010 | WO2010US60044 | Priority number, date | US20090286139P | 14.12.2009 Original published format: US 286139 P | US20100350161P | 01.06.2010 Original published format: US 350161 P | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011075430 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2512492 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K33/14, A61P27/10, A61P27/12 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
A61K31/675 (EP,US);
A61K31/14 (EP,US);
A61K31/4164 (EP,US);
A61K31/4425 (EP,US);
A61K31/66 (EP,US);
A61K33/00 (EP,US);
A61K33/14 (EP,US);
A61P27/02 (EP);
A61P27/10 (EP);
A61P27/12 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HEMMUNG VON GRAUEM STAR UND ALTERSWEITSICHTIGKEIT | [2012/43] | English: | METHODS OF INHIBITING CATARACTS AND PRESBYOPIA | [2012/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉS POUR EMPÊCHER DES CATARACTES ET LA PRESBYTIE | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 02.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.04.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.12.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 24.01.2019 | 14.01.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/22] | 24.01.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/22] | 24.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 02.10.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO0248190 (SIGMA TAU IND FARMACEUTI [IT], et al) [X] 1,2,5-7,19 * page 11, line 19 - page 12, line 4; claims 14,16 * * page 6, line 17 - page 7, line 5 * [I] 3,4,8-18; | [XI]WO9514482 (RENSSELAER POLYTECH INST [US]) [X] 1,2,5-7,19 * page 9, paragraph 3; claims 1-17 * * page 7, paragraph 2 * [I] 3,4,8-18; | [XI]DE3906311 (ADATOMED PHARMA & MED [DE]) [X] 1,2,5-7,19 * column 1, lines 44-46; claims 1,2 * * column 2, lines 9-11 * * column 3, line 67 - column 4, line 16 * [I] 3,4,8,9; | [XI]CN1093259 (WANG HUIKANG [CN]) [X] 1,2,5-7,19 * examples 1-4; claims 1-7 * [I] 3,4,8-18; | [A]WO2005117987 (GLAZIER ALAN N [US]) [A] 1-19 * paragraphs [0039] - [0047] *; | [A]WO2009051223 (R TECH UENO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-19 * example 1; tables 1-2 *; | [AP]EP2213303 (R TECH UENO LTD [JP]) [AP] 1-19 * example 1; tables 1-2 *; | [A]US5756672 (BUILDER STUART [US], et al) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | [A] - WANG ET AL, "Safety and efficacy of intracapsular tranilast microspheres in experimental posterior capsule opacification", JOURNAL CATARACT AND REFRACTIVE SURGERY, SURGERY, FAIRFAX, VA, US, (20071128), vol. 33, no. 12, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.JCRS.2007.07.041, ISSN 0886-3350, pages 2122 - 2128, XP022375747 [A] 1-19 * abstract * * table 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jcrs.2007.07.041 | [A] - QIAN J ET AL, "Effects of anionic surfactant SDS on the photophysical properties of two fluorescent molecular sensors", JOURNAL OF PHOTOCHEMISTRY AND PHOTOBIOLOGY, A: CHEMISTRY, ELSEVIER SEQUOIA, LAUSANNE, CH, vol. 200, no. 2-3, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.JPHOTOCHEM.2008.09.002, ISSN 1010-6030, (20081215), pages 402 - 409, (20080917), XP025681172 [A] 1-19 * page 403, column 1 * * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jphotochem.2008.09.002 | by applicant | US2008227700 | US5817726 | US5905125 | EP0781777 | US5942558 | US5658592 | US6027745 | WO03003073 | US2005079197 |