EP2536655 - METHOD AND FILLING SYSTEM FOR FILLING CONTAINERS WITH A FILLING MATERIAL COMPOSED OF AT LEAST TWO COMPONENTS IN A VOLUME- AND/OR AMOUNT-CONTROLLED MANNER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.09.2014 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/52] | For all designated states KHS GmbH Juchostrasse 20 44143 Dortmund / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRULITSCH, Dieter-Rudolf Stromberger Str. 22 b 55545 Bad Kreuznach / DE | 02 /
LORENZ, Jonathan Hofgartenstraße 16 55545 Bad Kreuznach / DE | [2012/52] | Application number, filing date | 10795614.6 | 07.12.2010 | WO2010EP07409 | Priority number, date | DE20101008166 | 16.02.2010 Original published format: DE102010008166 | [2012/52] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011101012 | Date: | 25.08.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2536655 | Date: | 26.12.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.08.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2536655 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.08.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B67C3/20 | [2012/52] | CPC: |
B67C3/20 (EP,US);
B67C3/023 (EP,US);
B67C3/206 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN SOWIE FÜLLSYSTEM ZUM VOLUMEN- UND/ODER MENGENGESTEUERTEN FÜLLEN VON BEHÄLTERN MIT EINEM ZUMINDEST AUS ZWEI KOMPONENTEN BESTEHENDEN FÜLLGUT | [2012/52] | English: | METHOD AND FILLING SYSTEM FOR FILLING CONTAINERS WITH A FILLING MATERIAL COMPOSED OF AT LEAST TWO COMPONENTS IN A VOLUME- AND/OR AMOUNT-CONTROLLED MANNER | [2012/52] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE REMPLISSAGE POUR LE REMPLISSAGE SELON UN VOLUME ET/OU UNE QUANTITÉ COMMANDÉS DE RÉCIPIENTS AVEC UN MATÉRIAU DE REMPLISSAGE CONSTITUÉ D'AU MOINS DEUX COMPOSANTS | [2012/52] | Entry into regional phase | 17.09.2012 | National basic fee paid | 17.09.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.09.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/52] | 02.04.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 20.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | 07.08.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.12.2010 | AL | 06.11.2013 | BG | 06.11.2013 | CY | 06.11.2013 | CZ | 06.11.2013 | DK | 06.11.2013 | EE | 06.11.2013 | ES | 06.11.2013 | FI | 06.11.2013 | HR | 06.11.2013 | LT | 06.11.2013 | LV | 06.11.2013 | MC | 06.11.2013 | MK | 06.11.2013 | MT | 06.11.2013 | NL | 06.11.2013 | RO | 06.11.2013 | RS | 06.11.2013 | SE | 06.11.2013 | SK | 06.11.2013 | SM | 06.11.2013 | TR | 06.11.2013 | IE | 07.12.2013 | LU | 07.12.2013 | BE | 31.12.2013 | NO | 06.02.2014 | GR | 07.02.2014 | IS | 06.03.2014 | PT | 06.03.2014 | [2018/46] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 07.12.2010 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
TR | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
LU | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | HU | 07.12.2010 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
LU | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
GR | 07.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/41] | HU | 07.12.2010 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
MT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
LU | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 07.12.2010 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
GR | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
LU | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 07.12.2010 | |
BG | 06.11.2013 | ||
CY | 06.11.2013 | ||
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
LU | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | CY | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
MK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 06.11.2013 | |
CZ | 06.11.2013 | ||
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/25] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
SM | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2015/21] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
MC | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
IE | 07.12.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/46] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
BE | 31.12.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
DK | 06.11.2013 | ||
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | CZ | 06.11.2013 | |
EE | 06.11.2013 | ||
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RO | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
SK | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | EE | 06.11.2013 | |
ES | 06.11.2013 | ||
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
PT | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
LV | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | ES | 06.11.2013 | |
FI | 06.11.2013 | ||
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
RS | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
HR | 06.11.2013 | ||
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
IS | 06.03.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 06.11.2013 | |
LT | 06.11.2013 | ||
NL | 06.11.2013 | ||
SE | 06.11.2013 | ||
NO | 06.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 06.11.2013 | |
NO | 06.02.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]DE8805380U (BADEN-CHEMIE GMBH [DE]) [X] 10,11,15,16 * figures 2,3 * * page 6 - page 10 *; | [A]US2002074348 (HEYES KEITH [GB]) [A] 1,10 * figures 1-4 * * paragraphs [0001] - [0008] *; | [X]FR2925022 (SIDEL PARTICIPATIONS [FR]) [X] 1,5 * figures 1-4B * * page 4, line 15 - page 5, line 12 *; | [A]WO2009129937 (KHS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,10* figures 6-8 *; | [E]EP2272790 (KRONES AG [DE]) [E] 1,5 * paragraphs [0038] - [0041] * * figures 2-6 * |