EP2520027 - AN ACTIVE ANTENNA ARRAY WITH A SINGLE COMMON CLOCK AND A METHOD FOR RELAYING A PLURALITY OF RADIO SIGNALS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 12.07.2013 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ubidyne Inc. The Corporation Trust Company 1209 Orange Street Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KENINGTON, Peter Linear Communications Consultants Ltd. Trap Farm Devauden Chepstow NP16 6PE / GB | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Harrison, Robert John Sonnenberg Harrison Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Harrison, Robert John 24IP Law Group Sonnenberg Fortmann Herzogspitalstraße 10a 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10795679.9 | 17.12.2010 | WO2010EP70113 | Priority number, date | US20090650021 | 30.12.2009 Original published format: US 650021 | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011080127 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2520027 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/04 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
H04B1/0483 (EP,US);
H04B7/15 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | AKTIVE ANTENNENANORDNUNG MIT GEMEINSAMEN EINZELTAKT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERMITTLUNG EINER VIELZAHL VON FUNKSIGNALEN | [2012/45] | English: | AN ACTIVE ANTENNA ARRAY WITH A SINGLE COMMON CLOCK AND A METHOD FOR RELAYING A PLURALITY OF RADIO SIGNALS | [2012/45] | French: | RÉSEAU D'ANTENNE ACTIVE AVEC HORLOGE COMMUNE UNIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE RELAIS D'UNE PLURALITÉ DE SIGNAUX RADIO | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 20.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/33] | 28.03.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2003032424 (JUDD MANO D [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,12-17,19-21 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0043]; figure 3 *; | [Y]WO2006053158 (ANALOG DEVICES INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-9,12,14-16,19,20 * figure 1 *; | [Y]KR20080043577 (HYNIX SEMICONDUCTOR INC [KR]) [Y] 2,4-6,8,9,13,14,16,17,21* abstract; paragraph [0028]; figures 2,3 * |