EP2519269 - DRUG-DELIVERY BALLOONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Scimed, Inc. One Scimed Place Mailstop A150 Maple Grove, MN 55311-1566 / US | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CLARKE, John T. Kiniska Claregalway Co. Galway / IE | 02 /
WEBER, Jan Holdaal 49 NL-6228 GJ Maastricht / NL | 03 /
FLANAGAN, Aiden Caherweelder Kilcolgan Co. Galway / IE | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Business Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/45] | Peterreins, Frank Fish & Richardson P.C. Highlight Towers Mies-van-der-Rohe-Strasse 8 80807 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10795834.0 | 07.12.2010 | WO2010US59203 | Priority number, date | US20100292924P | 07.01.2010 Original published format: US 292924 P | US20090291048P | 30.12.2009 Original published format: US 291048 P | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011090569 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519269 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61L29/08, A61L29/16 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
A61L29/16 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (EP,US);
A61L2300/624 (EP,US);
A61L2300/63 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | WIRKSTOFFFREISETZUNGSBALLONS | [2012/45] | English: | DRUG-DELIVERY BALLOONS | [2012/45] | French: | BALLONNETS DE DISTRIBUTION DE MÉDICAMENT | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 28.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/13] | 07.11.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2014/13] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2009246252 (ARPS JAMES HOWARD [US], et al) [X] 1-23 * page 1, paragraph 13 - paragraph 15 * * page 2, paragraphs 18,22,27,28 * * page 3, paragraph 46 * * page 4, paragraphs 50,60 * * page 5, paragraphs 74,77 * * page 7, paragraphs 105,107 * * page 8, paragraphs 108,109 * * page 9, paragraphs 131,133 * * page 10, paragraphs 140,141,147 *; | [X]US2003064965 (RICHTER JACOB [IL]) [X] 1-12,15,16,19,20,22,23 * page 2, paragraph 28 * * page 3, paragraphs 34,35 * * page 4, paragraphs 36,38 * * page 5, paragraphs 50,52,53 *; | [X]US6491617 (OGLE MATTHEW F [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15,16,19,20,22,23 * column 1, line 56 - line 61 * * column 2, line 9 - line 19 * * column 6, line 32 - line 35 * * column 7, line 45 - line 60 * * column 15, line 55 - column 16, line 12 * * claims 19,20,24 *; | [A]US5102402 (DROR MICHAEL [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * column 2, line 5 - line 34 * | by applicant | US6221316 | US6730699 | US2008287984 | - BIOCHEMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA, (1992), vol. 1123, pages 33 - 34 | - EUR. POLYMER J., (1994), vol. 30, pages 1327 - 1333 | - BIOMATERIALS, (2005), vol. 26, pages 661 - 670 | - TAHERIAN ET AL., INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OFFOOD PROPERTIES, (200801), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 24 - 43 | - TAHERIAN ET AL., NTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OFFOOD PROPERTIES, (200801), vol. 11, no. 1, pages 24 - 43 | - BALAKRISHNANA ET AL., JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (20081112), vol. 131, no. 3, pages 173 - 180 | - MOELLER ET AL., "AFM Nanoindentation of Polymers", MICROSC MICROANAL, (2007), vol. 13, no. 2 | US20090224723 |