EP2498621 - PROCEDURE AND METHOD FOR TREATING OILSEEDS BY MEANS OF MICROWAVES AND RUMEN-STABLE ANIMAL FEED FATS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Agricon Gesellschaft Für Agrar-, Bau- Und Ernährungswirtschaft mbH Alt Bartelsdorfer Strasse 18 b 18146 Rostock / DE | [2012/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BROCKMANN, Uwe Sanddornweg 8 18196 Dummerstorf / DE | [2012/38] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/38] | Application number, filing date | 10795911.6 | 24.08.2010 | [2015/41] | WO2010DE00985 | Priority number, date | DE20091038624 | 26.08.2009 Original published format: DE102009038624 | [2012/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011023168 | Date: | 03.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2498621 | Date: | 19.09.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.03.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2498621 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A23K1/00, A23K1/14, A23K1/18, A23L1/36, A23L1/025 | [2015/21] | CPC: |
A23K40/35 (EP);
A23K10/30 (EP);
A23K50/10 (EP);
A23L25/25 (EP);
A23L5/34 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2014/39] | A23K1/14, A23K1/18, A23L1/36, A23L1/025 | ||
Former IPC [2012/38] | A23K1/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | METHODE UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG DER SAMEN VON ÖLSAATEN MITTELS MIKROWELLEN UND PANSENSTABILEN FUTTERFETTEN | [2012/38] | English: | PROCEDURE AND METHOD FOR TREATING OILSEEDS BY MEANS OF MICROWAVES AND RUMEN-STABLE ANIMAL FEED FATS | [2012/38] | French: | MÉTHODE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE GRAINES OLÉAGINEUSES PAR MICRO-ONDES ET PAR LES GRAISSES, STABLES DANS LA PANSE | [2014/39] |
Former [2012/38] | MÉTHODE ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT DE GRAINES OLÉAGINEUSES PAR MICRO-ONDES ET PAR LES GRAISSES, STABLES DANS LA PANSE, POUR ALIMENTS POUR ANIMAUX | Entry into regional phase | 23.04.2012 | National basic fee paid | 01.08.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.04.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.04.2012 | Examination requested [2012/38] | 01.06.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 06.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.08.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.12.2014 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.01.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 21.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.09.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.08.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees MK, EE, TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 01.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 01.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2012 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 01.08.2012 | Request for further processing filed | 01.08.2012 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2012 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 24.08.2010 | AL | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | CZ | 07.10.2015 | DK | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | ES | 07.10.2015 | FI | 07.10.2015 | HR | 07.10.2015 | IT | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | LV | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | MK | 07.10.2015 | MT | 07.10.2015 | NL | 07.10.2015 | PL | 07.10.2015 | RO | 07.10.2015 | SE | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | SK | 07.10.2015 | SM | 07.10.2015 | TR | 07.10.2015 | NO | 07.01.2016 | GR | 08.01.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | PT | 08.02.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 24.08.2010 | |
BG | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/33] | HU | 24.08.2010 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
MT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 24.08.2010 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 24.08.2010 | |
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
MK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/23] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/38] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
SM | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | CZ | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/26] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
NL | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/25] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LV | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
HR | 07.10.2015 | ||
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/21] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
IT | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
NO | 07.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR2768025 (UNICOPA [FR]) [A] 1-5 * page 4, line 25 - line 31; claim 1 *; | [Y]US2004022928 (DERKS GARY [CA]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraph [0027]; claims 1,5 *; | [Y]EP1741347 (BIO SCIENCE CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 1-5 * paragraphs [0012] , [0013] , [0041]; claim 1 *; | [A]DE102006040425 (BERG & SCHMIDT GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1-5* paragraphs [0007] , [0008]; claims 1,10 *; | [A] - PONCET, C.; REMOND, D.; LEPAGE, E.; DOREAU, M., "Comment mieux valoriser les protéagineux et oléagineux en alimentation des ruminants", FOURRAGES, (20030607), pages 205 - 229, URL: http://www.afpf-asso.org/main.php?url=./fourrages/articles/liste/acces.php&num=1486, (20110315), XP002627325 [A] 1-5 * page 211, paragraph 4 - page 212, paragraph 6 * | [A] - YU P ET AL, "Ruminal behavior of protein and starch free organic matter of Llupinus albus and Vicia faba in dairy cows", ASIAN-AUSTRALASIAN JOURNAL OF ANIMAL SCIENCES, SUWEON, KR, (20020701), vol. 15, no. 7, ISSN 1011-2367, pages 974 - 981, XP008133520 [A] 1-5 * tables 3,4 * * abstract * |