EP2451752 - WASTEWATER SLUDGE PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nowa Technology, Inc. 5300 West 94th Terrace Prairie Village, KS 66207 / US | [2012/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Deshazo Eugene F. 9212 Roe Avenue Prairie Village, KS 66207-2602 / US | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau B.V. De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2012/20] | Verhees, Godefridus Josephus Maria Brabants Octrooibureau B.V. De Pinckart 54 5674 CC Nuenen / NL | Application number, filing date | 10797801.7 | 07.07.2010 | WO2010US41245 | Priority number, date | US20090223617P | 07.07.2009 Original published format: US 223617 P | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011005883 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2451752 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 16.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C02F11/12, C02F1/04, C10L3/08, B01D25/12 | [2012/20] | CPC: |
C02F9/00 (EP,US);
C02F11/121 (EP,KR,US);
B01D25/12 (KR);
C02F1/04 (EP,KR,US);
C02F11/002 (EP,KR,US);
C02F11/18 (EP,KR,US);
C10L1/026 (EP,KR,US);
C10L3/08 (KR);
C10L5/46 (EP,KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR AUFBEREITUNG VON ABWASSERSCHLAMM | [2012/20] | English: | WASTEWATER SLUDGE PROCESSING SYSTEM | [2012/20] | French: | SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT DE BOUES D'EAUX USÉES | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US4906388 (CAIN FRANK J [US], et al); | [Y]JPH04197500 (HOSOKAWA MICRON KK); | [Y]US5256251 (HOLCOMBE THOMAS C [US]); | [A]US6149802 (ZAVARISE DINO LOUIS [CA], et al) |