EP2451459 - METHOD OF REDUCING MULTI-DRUG RESISTANCE USING INOSITOL TRIPYROPHOSPHATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.10.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL, IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Normoxys, Inc. 16 Laurel Avenue Suite 150 Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | For all designated states Université de Strasbourg 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2017/47] |
Former [2012/20] | For all designated states Normoxys, Inc. 16 Laurel Avenue Suite 150 Wellesley, MA 02481 / US | ||
For all designated states Université de Strasbourg 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NICOLAU, Yves, Claude 166 Greenwood Street Newton MA 02459 / US | 02 /
LEHN, Jean-marie 6 Rue Des Pontoniers F-67000 Strasbourg / FR | 03 /
KIEDA, Claudine 2 Rue De La Tour F-45000 Orleans / FR | [2012/20] | Representative(s) | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwälte und Solicitor PartG mbB Steinsdorfstraße 2 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/47] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Patentanwalt und Solicitor PartG mbB Postfach 44 05 16 80754 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/39] | Grund, Martin Grund Intellectual Property Group Postfach 44 05 16 D-80754 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/20] | Stephen, Robert John, et al Olswang LLP 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 10797804.1 | 07.07.2010 | [2017/47] | WO2010US41250 | Priority number, date | US20090223583P | 07.07.2009 Original published format: US 223583 P | [2012/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011005886 | Date: | 13.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2451459 | Date: | 16.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2451459 | Date: | 22.11.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 13.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/337, A61K31/6615, A61K33/24, A61K31/282, A61K31/4745, A61K31/513, A61K31/7068, A61P35/00 | [2017/15] | CPC: |
A61K33/243 (EP,US);
A61K31/6615 (US);
A61K31/282 (US);
A61K31/337 (EP,US);
A61K31/4745 (US);
A61K31/513 (US);
A61K31/665 (EP,US);
A61K31/7068 (US);
A61K33/24 (EP,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P17/12 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K31/337, A61K2300/00 (EP,US);
A61K31/665, A61K2300/00 (US,EP);
A61K33/24, A61K2300/00 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [2013/49] | A61K31/6615, A61K33/24, A61K31/337, A61P35/00, A61K45/06 | ||
Former IPC [2012/20] | A61K31/6615, A61K33/24, A61K31/337, A61P35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR REDUZIERUNG EINER MULTIRESISTENZ GEGEN ARZNEIMITTEL MITTELS INOSITOL-TRIPYROPHOSPHAT | [2012/20] | English: | METHOD OF REDUCING MULTI-DRUG RESISTANCE USING INOSITOL TRIPYROPHOSPHATE | [2012/20] | French: | MÉTHODE DE RÉDUCTION D'UNE RÉSISTANCE MULTIMÉDICAMENTEUSE À L'AIDE D'INOSITOL TRIPYROPHOSPHATE | [2012/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/20] | 04.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 11.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 30.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/44] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 11.05.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 11.05.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 06.06.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   30.12.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 07.07.2010 | AL | 22.11.2017 | AT | 22.11.2017 | CY | 22.11.2017 | CZ | 22.11.2017 | DK | 22.11.2017 | EE | 22.11.2017 | ES | 22.11.2017 | FI | 22.11.2017 | HR | 22.11.2017 | IT | 22.11.2017 | LT | 22.11.2017 | LV | 22.11.2017 | MC | 22.11.2017 | MK | 22.11.2017 | NL | 22.11.2017 | PL | 22.11.2017 | PT | 22.11.2017 | RO | 22.11.2017 | SE | 22.11.2017 | SI | 22.11.2017 | SK | 22.11.2017 | SM | 22.11.2017 | TR | 22.11.2017 | BG | 22.02.2018 | NO | 22.02.2018 | GR | 23.02.2018 | IS | 22.03.2018 | GB | 07.07.2018 | IE | 07.07.2018 | LU | 07.07.2018 | MT | 07.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | FR | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
MK | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
GB | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
MT | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 07.07.2010 | |
AT | 22.11.2017 | ||
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PT | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
GB | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
MT | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
TR | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
GB | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
MT | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
GB | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
MT | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
GB | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
FR | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
GB | 07.07.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
IE | 07.07.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
LU | 07.07.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
MC | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SI | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
RO | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
IT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
PL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
SM | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
CY | 22.11.2017 | ||
CZ | 22.11.2017 | ||
DK | 22.11.2017 | ||
EE | 22.11.2017 | ||
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
SK | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
LV | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
BG | 22.02.2018 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 22.11.2017 | |
ES | 22.11.2017 | ||
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
HR | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
SE | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | ||
GR | 23.02.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 22.11.2017 | |
FI | 22.11.2017 | ||
LT | 22.11.2017 | ||
NL | 22.11.2017 | ||
NO | 22.02.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2007081315 (OXYPLUS INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * page 12, lines 17-20 *; | [A] - FYLAKTAKIDOU K C ET AL, "Inositol tripyrophosphate: a new membrane permeant allosteric effector of haemoglobin", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS, PERGAMON, GB, (20050315), vol. 15, no. 6, doi:10.1016/J.BMCL.2005.01.064, ISSN 0960-894X, pages 1605 - 1608, XP004771154 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bmcl.2005.01.064 | [Y] - SAIARDI ADOLFO ET AL, "Inositol pyrophosphates regulate cell death and telomere length through phosphoinositide 3-kinase-related protein kinases", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20050208), vol. 102, no. 6, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 1911 - 1914, XP002715367 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0409322102 | [Y] - NG S S W ET AL, "INHIBITION OF PHOSPHATIDYLINOSITIDE 3-KINASE ENHANCES GEMCITABINE-INDUCED APOPTOSIS IN HUMAN PANCREATIC CANCER CELLS", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20001001), vol. 60, no. 19, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 5451 - 5455, XP001084246 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | [Y] - HUANG CHUANSHU ET AL, "Inositol hexaphosphate inhibits cell transformation and activator protein 1 activation by targeting phosphatidylinositol-3' kinase", CANCER RESEARCH, (1997), vol. 57, no. 14, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2873 - 2878, XP002715368 [Y] 1-15 * the whole document * | International search | [X]WO2006102060 (OXYPLUS INC [US], et al); | [X] - BIOLO, A. ET AL., "Enhanced exercise capacity in mice with severe heart failure treated with an allosteric effector of hemoglobin, myo-inositol trispyrophosphate", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2009), vol. 106, no. 6, pages 1926 - 1929, XP008151127 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0812381106 | [Y] - KIEDA, C. ET AL., "Suppression of hypoxia-induced HIF-1alpha and of angiogenesis in endothelial cells by myo-inositol trispyrophosphate-treated erythrocytes", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (2006), vol. 103, no. 42, pages 15576 - 15581, XP008121655 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0607109103 |