Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102812779B | Global Dossier | 25.05.2016 | B | CN102812779 | 05.12.2012 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP70587 | 22.12.2010 | EP09180513 | 23.12.2009 | EP10151196 | 20.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2517535 | Global Dossier | 24.05.2017 | B1 | EP2517535 | 31.10.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP10798097 | 22.12.2010 | WO2010EP70587 | 22.12.2010 | EP09180513 | 23.12.2009 | EP10151196 | 20.01.2010 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE112010004983 | 18.04.2024 | B4 | DE112010004983T | 24.01.2013 | T5 | Priority number | Date | WO2010EP70587 | 22.12.2010 | EP09180513 | 23.12.2009 | EP10151196 | 20.01.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2011076898 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09180513 | 23.12.2009 | EP10151196 | 20.01.2010 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2341760 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP09180513 | 23.12.2009 | EP10151196 | 20.01.2010 |