EP2519481 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING CERAMIC FIBERS OF A COMPOSITION IN THE SiC RANGE AND FOR PRODUCING SiC FIBERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BJS Ceramics GmbH Senefelderstrasse 1 86368 Gersthofen / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2015/31] | For all designated states BJS Ceramics GmbH Lehbergring 19 86637 Zusamaltheim / DE | ||
Former [2012/49] | For all designated states SGL Carbon SE Söhnleinstrasse 8 65201 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2012/45] | For all designated states SGL Carbon SE Rheingaustrasse 182 65203 Wiesbaden / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SITTER, Sandra Belgradstr. 68 80796 München / DE | 02 /
REITER, Birgit Höhenstr. 74 40227 Düsseldorf / DE | [2016/01] |
Former [2012/45] | 01 /
SITTER, Sandra Belgradstr. 68 80796 München / DE | ||
02 /
REITER, Birgit Rhönstr. 3 93057 Regensburg / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/45] | Application number, filing date | 10798324.9 | 21.12.2010 | [2016/16] | WO2010EP70430 | Priority number, date | DE20091055429 | 30.12.2009 Original published format: DE102009055429 | [2012/45] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011080162 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519481 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2519481 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | DE | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/571, C04B35/622, C04B35/626, C04B35/634, C08G77/50, D01D5/04, D01F6/78, D01F9/10 | [2015/45] | CPC: |
C04B35/571 (EP,US);
C04B35/62281 (EP,US);
C04B35/6264 (EP,US);
C04B35/6267 (EP,US);
C04B35/63408 (EP,US);
C04B35/63432 (EP,US);
C04B35/63436 (EP,US);
C04B35/63444 (EP,US);
C08G77/50 (EP,US);
D01D5/04 (EP,US);
D01F6/78 (EP,US);
D01F9/10 (EP,US);
C04B2235/483 (EP,US);
C04B2235/5264 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6021 (US);
C04B2235/6022 (EP,US);
C04B2235/652 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6567 (EP,US);
C04B2235/658 (EP,US);
C04B2235/6582 (EP,US);
C04B2235/723 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/45] | C04B35/622, C04B35/571, C04B35/626, C08L83/16, D01F9/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KERAMIKFASERN MIT EINER ZUSAMMENSETZUNG IM BEREICH SiC UND SiC-FASERN | [2012/45] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING CERAMIC FIBERS OF A COMPOSITION IN THE SiC RANGE AND FOR PRODUCING SiC FIBERS | [2012/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE FIBRES CÉRAMIQUES PRÉSENTANT UNE COMPOSITION DE SIC ET DE FIBRES DE SIC | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 30.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 30.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 13.02.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.11.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.05.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.05.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 19.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 11.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.12.2010 | AL | 20.04.2016 | BG | 20.04.2016 | CY | 20.04.2016 | CZ | 20.04.2016 | DK | 20.04.2016 | EE | 20.04.2016 | ES | 20.04.2016 | FI | 20.04.2016 | HR | 20.04.2016 | IS | 20.04.2016 | IT | 20.04.2016 | LT | 20.04.2016 | LV | 20.04.2016 | MC | 20.04.2016 | MK | 20.04.2016 | MT | 20.04.2016 | NL | 20.04.2016 | PL | 20.04.2016 | RO | 20.04.2016 | RS | 20.04.2016 | SE | 20.04.2016 | SI | 20.04.2016 | SK | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | TR | 20.04.2016 | NO | 20.07.2016 | GR | 21.07.2016 | PT | 22.08.2016 | AT | 21.12.2016 | IE | 21.12.2016 | LU | 21.12.2016 | BE | 31.12.2016 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/43] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
MT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/38] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
BG | 20.04.2016 | ||
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/30] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IS | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
TR | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 21.12.2010 | |
CY | 20.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2016 | ||
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
MK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2018/24] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
AT | 21.12.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/49] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
IE | 21.12.2016 | ||
LU | 21.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/47] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
MC | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/36] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SI | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
BE | 31.12.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
SM | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
SK | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | CZ | 20.04.2016 | |
DK | 20.04.2016 | ||
EE | 20.04.2016 | ||
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RO | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 20.04.2016 | |
ES | 20.04.2016 | ||
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
IT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
SE | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
GR | 21.07.2016 | ||
PT | 22.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | ES | 20.04.2016 | |
FI | 20.04.2016 | ||
HR | 20.04.2016 | ||
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
LV | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
RS | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 20.04.2016 | |
LT | 20.04.2016 | ||
NL | 20.04.2016 | ||
PL | 20.04.2016 | ||
NO | 20.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 20.04.2016 | |
NO | 20.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [A]US5278110 (TOREKI WILLIAM [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 6 *; | [A]US5792416 (SACKS MICHAEL D [US], et al) [A] 1-16 * column 11 *; | [A]US3892583 (WINTER GERHARD, et al) [A] 1-16 * column 4 *; | [AD]DE102004042531 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [AD] 1-16 * the whole document *; | [AP]WO2010072739 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [AP] 1-16 * the whole document * | [A] - William Toreki et Al., "Polymer-Derived Silicon Carbide Fibers with low Oxygen Content", Proceedings of the 16th Annual Conference on Composites and Advanced Ceramic Materials, Part 1 of 2: Ceramic Engineering and Science Proceedings (ed J. B. Wachtman),, John Wiley & Sons, Inc., Hoboken, NJ, USA, vol. 13, no. 7/8, doi:10.1002/9780470313954.ch22, (20080326), pages 145 - 159, Wiley Online Library, URL: http://onlinelibrary.wiley.com/doi/10.1002/9780470313954.ch22/summary, (20110228), XP002625435 [A] 1-16 * Kapitel "Experimental methods - Synthesis and Processing" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0266-3538(94)90185-6 | [A] - CLADE J ET AL, "A new type of precursor for fibers in the system Si-C", JOURNAL OF THE EUROPEAN CERAMIC SOCIETY, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, BARKING, ESSEX, GB, (20050101), vol. 25, no. 2-3, doi:10.1016/J.JEURCERAMSOC.2004.07.009, ISSN 0955-2219, pages 123 - 127, XP004655094 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jeurceramsoc.2004.07.009 | [A] - XUE J-G ET AL, "Preparation of low oxygen SiC fiber by dry spinning", WUJI CAILIAO XUEBAO/JOURNAL OF INORGANIC MATERIALS, SCIENCE PRESS; RESEARCH CENTER FOR ECO-ENVIRONMENTAL SCIENCES; CHINESE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES CN, (200707), vol. 22, no. 4, pages 681 - 684, XP002625436 [A] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3724/SP.J.1077.2007.00681 | by applicant | DE102004042531 |