EP2659230 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS OF PROVIDING INFORMATION USING A NAVIGATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.09.2018 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2018 | Change - divisional application(s) | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | 28.09.2018 | Withdrawal of application | published on 31.10.2018 [2018/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/19] | For all designated states TomTom International B.V. De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2014/12] | For all designated states TomTom International B.V. Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT Amsterdam / NL | ||
Former [2013/45] | For all designated states Tomtom International BV IP Creation Rembrandtplein 35 1017 CT Amsterdam / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ALDERS, Michel Prinseneiland 3 NL-1013 LL Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
VAN HEMERT, Jasper-Michiel Berkelstraat 151 NL-3522 EN Utrecht / NL | 03 /
BUKOWSKA, Magdalena Muntendamstraat 7 NL-1091 DR Amsterdam / NL | 04 /
VADILLO PALACIO, Ana Jan van Galenstraat NL-1056 BT Amsterdam / NL | 05 /
GEUL, Sandra Polanenstraat 244 NL-1013 WD Amsterdam / NL | 06 /
BENNINK, Jeroen Klinkerweg 3 NL-1033 PJ Amsterdam / NL | 07 /
ABEN, Sjoerd Tulpstraat 26 NL-1815 XG Alkmaar / NL | 08 /
ZIEZOLD, Hendrik Looiersgracht 28 3-5 NL-1016 VS Amsterdam / NL | [2013/45] | Representative(s) | Dobson, Adrian TomTom International B.V. IP Creation De Ruijterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2013/45] | Dobson, Adrian TomTom International B.V. IP Creation De Ruyterkade 154 1011 AC Amsterdam / NL | Application number, filing date | 10798363.7 | 30.12.2010 | WO2010EP70905 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2012089265 | Date: | 05.07.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2659230 | Date: | 06.11.2013 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.07.2012 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2013/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.07.2012 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36 | [2013/45] | CPC: |
G01C21/3655 (EP,US);
G01C21/20 (US);
G01C21/3697 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/45] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON INFORMATIONEN UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER NAVIGATIONSVORRICHTUNG | [2013/45] | English: | METHODS AND SYSTEMS OF PROVIDING INFORMATION USING A NAVIGATION APPARATUS | [2013/45] | French: | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES D'INFORMATION UTILISANT UN APPAREIL DE NAVIGATION | [2013/45] | Entry into regional phase | 12.08.2013 | National basic fee paid | 12.08.2013 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.08.2013 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 17.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.09.2018 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2018/44] | 24.09.2018 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.10.2018 | 01.10.2018 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | Divisional application(s) | EP18196256.4 / EP3450920 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2015 | Request for further processing for: | 12.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 12.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 12.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2013 | Decision despatched | 12.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2013 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SM, SK, SI, SE, RS, RO, PT, PL, NO, NL, MT, MK, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, HR, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT, AL | 12.08.2013 | Request for further processing filed | 12.08.2013 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.09.2013 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.07.2013 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   12.08.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]US2005154505 (NAKAMURA KOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,7-9,16,21,22 * paragraphs [0003] , [0122] , [0182] , [0193] - [0198] - [0203] , [0207] , [0246] , [0268] , [0284]; figures 30A, 31, 32 * [Y] 5 [I] 23,24; | [A]US2009112462 (LO EDDY [US]) [A] 1,16* figure 6 *; | [Y]US2009195411 (ICHIHASHI SYO [JP], et al) [Y] 5 * paragraphs [0031] , [0025]; figures 3,4,5,6 * | Examination | EP1266238 |