EP2525890 - FILTER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Spherefil GmbH Wurzacher Stasse 3 88299 Leutkirch / DE | [2012/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KRÜGER, Adam c/o Spherefil GmbH Wurzacher Stasse 3 88299 Leutkirch / DE | [2012/48] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/48] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10798513.7 | 21.12.2010 | WO2010EP07832 | Priority number, date | DE20101020924 | 19.05.2010 Original published format: DE102010020924 | DE20101005583 | 22.01.2010 Original published format: DE102010005583 | [2012/48] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011088879 | Date: | 28.07.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/30] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2525890 | Date: | 28.11.2012 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | B01D46/02, B01D46/00, B01D46/52, F24F3/16, F24F13/28 | [2012/48] | CPC: |
B01D46/521 (EP,US);
B01D46/0001 (EP,US);
B01D46/0005 (EP,US);
B01D46/02 (EP,US);
B01D46/023 (EP,US);
B01D46/522 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/48] | Title | German: | FILTER UND VERFAHREN ZU DESSEN HERSTELLUNG | [2012/48] | English: | FILTER AND METHOD FOR THE PRODUCTION THEREOF | [2012/48] | French: | FILTRE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2012/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.11.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 10.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/48] | 24.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 21.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2015/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.11.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2014 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]CH231610 (AUERGESELLSCHAFT AG [DE]) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [X]DE7835720U (DELBAG-LUFTFILTER GMBH) [X] 1-12 * the whole document *; | [XI]US4197099 (LUNDBERG BO E I H [MX]) [X] 6,8-12 * column 1, line 65 - column 2, line 32; figure 1 *[I] 1-4; | [XDI]WO0102078 (BANGERT PAUL [DE]) [XD] 6-12 * page 2 - page 4 * * page 7 - page 9; figures 1,2 * [I] 1-4 | by applicant | WO0102078 |