EP2513146 - ANTIBODIES AGAINST ROR1 CAPABLE OF INDUCING CELL DEATH OF CLL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2012/43] | BIOLOGICAL INHIBITORS OF ROR1 CAPABLE OF INDUCING CELL DEATH | ||
[2016/48] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 21.02.2020 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 31.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.05.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kancera AB Karolinska Science Park Banvaktsvägen 22 171 48 Solna / SE | [2015/11] |
Former [2012/43] | For all designated states BioInvent International AB Sölvegatan 41 223 70 Lund / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MELLSTEDT, Håkan Nybrogatan 45 B Stockholm 114 39 / SE | 02 /
RABBANI, Hodjattallah Midskeppsgatan 1 5 tr 120 79 Stockholm / SE | 03 /
TEIGE, Ingrid Raketgatan 6 244 57 Lund / SE | [2017/18] |
Former [2012/43] | 01 /
MELLSTEDT, Håkan Nybrogatan 45 B Stockholm 114 39 / SE | ||
02 /
RABBANI, Hodjattallah Midskeppsgatan 1 5 tr S-120 79 Stockholm / SE | |||
03 /
TEIGE, Ingrid Raketgatan 6 S-244 57 Lund / SE | Representative(s) | Novitas Patent AB P.O. Box 55557 102 04 Stockholm / SE | [2017/18] |
Former [2012/43] | Höglund, Lars, et al Albihns.Zacco AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10798728.1 | 10.12.2010 | [2017/18] | WO2010EP07524 | Priority number, date | GB20100009307 | 03.06.2010 Original published format: GB 201009307 | GB20090022143 | 18.12.2009 Original published format: GB 0922143 | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011079902 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2513146 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2513146 | Date: | 03.05.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.09.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28 | [2012/43] | CPC: |
C07K16/2803 (EP,US);
C07K16/28 (US);
C12N15/1137 (EP,US);
C12N15/1138 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,US);
C07K2317/34 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANTIKÖRPER GEGEN ROR1, DIE CLL ZELLTOD VERURSACHEN | [2016/48] | English: | ANTIBODIES AGAINST ROR1 CAPABLE OF INDUCING CELL DEATH OF CLL | [2016/48] | French: | ANTICORPS CONTRE ROR1 INDUISANT LA MORT CELLULAIRE DE CELLULES CLL | [2016/48] |
Former [2012/43] | ZELLTOD INDUZIERENDE BIOLOGISCHE ROR1-HEMMER | ||
Former [2012/43] | BIOLOGICAL INHIBITORS OF ROR1 CAPABLE OF INDUCING CELL DEATH | ||
Former [2012/43] | MATÉRIAUX BIOLOGIQUES ET UTILISATIONS DE CEUX-CI | Entry into regional phase | 04.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 04.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 23.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.12.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.11.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.03.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.12.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2018
12.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bischof, Oliver Bischof & Partner Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB An den Speichern 6 48157 Münster / DE | 02
05.02.2018
12.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Taylor, David Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London Greater London W1W 8AG / GB Opponent's representative Lewis Silkin LLP Arbor 255 Blackfriars Road London SE1 9AX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2019/40] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2018
12.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bischof, Oliver Bischof & Partner Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB An den Speichern 6 48157 Münster / DE | ||
02
05.02.2018
12.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Taylor, David Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London Greater London W1W 8AG / GB Opponent's representative Lewis Silkin LLP 5 Chancery Lane Clifford's Inn London EC4A 1BL / GB | |||
Former [2018/11] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
05.02.2018
ADMISSIBLE Bischof, Oliver Bischof & Partner Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB An den Speichern 6 48157 Münster / DE | ||
02
05.02.2018
Taylor, David Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London Greater London W1W 8AG / GB Opponent's representative Taylor, David Matthew Joseph, et al, et al Ablett & Stebbing 7-8 Market Place London Greater London W1W 8AG / GB | 15.02.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 24.08.2018 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.11.2019 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 17.11.2019 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2020/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.12.2010 | AL | 03.05.2017 | AT | 03.05.2017 | CY | 03.05.2017 | CZ | 03.05.2017 | EE | 03.05.2017 | FI | 03.05.2017 | HR | 03.05.2017 | LT | 03.05.2017 | LV | 03.05.2017 | MC | 03.05.2017 | MK | 03.05.2017 | PL | 03.05.2017 | PT | 03.05.2017 | RO | 03.05.2017 | RS | 03.05.2017 | SI | 03.05.2017 | SK | 03.05.2017 | SM | 03.05.2017 | TR | 03.05.2017 | BG | 03.08.2017 | NO | 03.08.2017 | GR | 04.08.2017 | IS | 03.09.2017 | IE | 10.12.2017 | LU | 10.12.2017 | MT | 10.12.2017 | [2022/26] |
Former [2020/33] | HU | 10.12.2010 | |
AL | 03.05.2017 | ||
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
Former [2020/22] | HU | 10.12.2010 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
PT | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 10.12.2010 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
MK | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 10.12.2010 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CY | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 10.12.2010 | |
AT | 03.05.2017 | ||
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
MC | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
IE | 10.12.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
LU | 10.12.2017 | ||
MT | 10.12.2017 | ||
Former [2018/25] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SI | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
SM | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
CZ | 03.05.2017 | ||
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RO | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
SK | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
EE | 03.05.2017 | ||
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
LV | 03.05.2017 | ||
PL | 03.05.2017 | ||
RS | 03.05.2017 | ||
BG | 03.08.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | AT | 03.05.2017 | |
FI | 03.05.2017 | ||
HR | 03.05.2017 | ||
LT | 03.05.2017 | ||
NO | 03.08.2017 | ||
GR | 04.08.2017 | ||
IS | 03.09.2017 | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2005100605 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13-31 * the whole document * [I] 8-12; | [XI]WO2007146957 (IRM LLC [BM], et al) [X] 8-11 * the whole document * [I] 1-7,12-31; | [XA]WO2008076868 (ABBOTT LAB [US], et al) [X] 1-7,13-31 * the whole document * [A] 8-12; | [XP]WO2010124188 (US HEALTH [US], et al) [XP] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [XA] - AMIR H DANESHMANESH ET AL, "Ror1, a cell surface receptor tyrosine kinase is expressed in chronic lymphocytic leukemia and may serve as a putative target for therapy", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CANCER, JOHN WILEY & SONS, INC, UNITED STATES, SWITZERLAND, GERMANY, vol. 123, no. 5, doi:DOI:10.1002/IJC.23587, ISSN 0020-7136, (20080901), pages 1190 - 1195, (20080610), XP002622341 [X] 1-7,27 * the whole document * [A] 8-26,28-31 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/ijc.23587 | [I] - BASKAR SIVASUBRAMANIAN ET AL, "Unique cell surface expression of receptor tyrosine kinase ROR1 in human B-cell chronic lymphocytic leukemia", CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, THE AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER RESEARCH, US, (20080115), vol. 14, no. 2, doi:DOI:10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-1823, ISSN 1078-0432, pages 396 - 404, XP009135221 [I] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/1078-0432.CCR-07-1823 | [A] - LAPALOMBELLA ROSA ET AL, "Lenalidomide treatment promotes CD154 expression on CLL cells and enhances production of antibodies by normal B cells through a PI3-kinase-dependent pathway", BLOOD, AMERICAN SOCIETY OF HEMATOLOGY, US, vol. 115, no. 13, doi:DOI:10.1182/BLOOD-2009-09-242438, ISSN 0006-4971, (20091124), pages 2619 - 2629, (20091124), XP009146859 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1182/blood-2009-09-242438 | [A] - FUKUDA TETSUYA ET AL, "Antisera induced by infusions of autologous Ad-CD154-leukemia B cells identify ROR1 as an oncofetal,antigen and receptor for Wnt5a", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES (PNAS), NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCE, US, vol. 105, no. 8, doi:DOI:10.1073/PNAS.0712148105, ISSN 0027-8424, (20080226), pages 3047 - 3052, (20080219), XP009135222 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0712148105 | [X] - MACKEIGAN JEFFREY P ET AL, "Sensitized RNAi screen of human kinases and phosphatases identifies new regulators of apoptosis and chemoresistance", NATURE CELL BIOLOGY, NATURE PUBLISHING GROUP, GB, (20050601), vol. 7, no. 6, doi:DOI:10.1038/NCB1258, ISSN 1465-7392, pages 591 - 600, XP002425115 [X] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/ncb1258 | [XP] - ANIRUDDHA CHOUDHURY ET AL, "Silencing of ROR1 and FMOD with siRNA results in apoptosis of CLL cells", BRITISH JOURNAL OF HAEMATOLOGY, WILEY-BLACKWELL PUBLISHING LTD, GB, vol. 151, no. 4, doi:DOI:10.1111/J.1365-2141.2010.08362.X, ISSN 0007-1048, (20100831), pages 327 - 335, (20100831), XP002622344 [XP] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1365-2141.2010.08362.x | [X] - J. W. TYNER ET AL, "RNAi screen for rapid therapeutic target identification in leukemia patients", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20090526), vol. 106, no. 21, doi:10.1073/pnas.0903233106, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 8695 - 8700, XP055003694 [X] 1-31 * the whole document * * including supporting information * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0903233106 | [A] - TAKAYAMA K ET AL, "Suppression of tumor angiogenesis and growth by gene transfer of a soluble form of vascular endothelial growth factor receptor into a remote organ", CANCER RESEARCH, AMERICAN ASSOCIATION FOR CANCER REREARCH, US, (20000415), vol. 60, no. 8, ISSN 0008-5472, pages 2169 - 2177, XP002312417 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | [A] - HEANEY D L ET AL, "SOLUBLE RECEPTORS IN HUMAN DISEASE", JOURNAL OF LEUKOCYTE BIOLOGY, FEDERATION OF AMERICAN SOCIETIES FOR EXPERIMENTAL BIOLOGY, US, (19980801), vol. 64, no. 2, ISSN 0741-5400, pages 135 - 146, XP008005930 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | Examination | - DANESHMANESH A H ET AL, Monoclonal antibodies against ROR1 induce apoptosis of chronic lymphocytic leukemia (CLL) cells., LEUKEMIA JUN 2012, VOL. 26, NR. 6, PAGE(S) 1348 - 1355, (201206), ISSN 1476-5551 | by applicant | US4440859 | US4530901 | US4582800 | US4677063 | US4678751 | US4704362 | US4710463 | US4757006 | US4766075 | US4810648 | WO9816643 | - CHIORAZZI N ET AL., N ENGL J MED, (2005), vol. 352, pages 804 - 15 | - DAMLE RN ET AL., BLOOD, (1999), vol. 94, pages 1840 - 7 | - HAMBLIN TJ ET AL., BLOOD, (1999), vol. 94, pages 1848 - 54 | - KLEIN U ET AL., J EXP MED, (2001), vol. 194, pages 1625 - 38 | - ROSENWALD A ET AL., J EXP MED, (2001), vol. 194, pages 1639 - 47 | - GLASS DJ ET AL., CELL, (1996), vol. 85, pages 513 - 23 | - MASIAKOWSKI P ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1992), vol. 267, pages 26181 - 90 | - VALENZUELA DM ET AL., NEURON, (1995), vol. 15, pages 573 - 84 | - MASIAKOWSKI P ET AL., BIOL CHEM, (1992), vol. 267, pages 26181 - 90 | - YODA A ET AL., J RECEPT SIGNAL TRANSDUCT RES, (2003), vol. 23, pages 1 - 15 | - REDDY UR ET AL., ONCOGENE, (1996), vol. 13, pages 1555 - 9 | - MORRISON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1984), vol. 81, pages 6851 - 6855 | - BETTER ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, page 1041 | - SKERRA ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, page 1038 | - BIRD ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 242, page 423 | - HUSTON ET AL., PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (1988), vol. 85, page 5879 | - WARD ET AL., NATURE, (1989), vol. 341, page 544 | - WINTER ET AL., NATURE, (1991), vol. 349, pages 293 - 299 | - D. WILKINSON, The Scientist, THE SCIENTIST, INC., (20000417), vol. 14, pages 25 - 28 | - MCCAFFREYA. P., MEUSEL., PHAMT. T., CONKLIND. S., HANNON, G. J.KAY, M. A., "RNA interference in adult mice", NATURE, (2002), vol. 418, pages 38 - 39 | - SONGE., LEES. K., WANQ, J. ET AL., NAT. MED., (2003), vol. 9, pages 347 - 351 | - SAIKI ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 239, pages 487 - 491 | - KOHLERMILSTEIN C, NATURE, (1975), vol. 256, pages 495 - 7 | - HARRIS NL ET AL., HISTOPATHOLOGY, (2000), vol. 36, pages 69 - 86 | - CHESON B ET AL., BLOOD, (1996), vol. 87, pages 4990 - 4997 | - REZVANY MR ET AL., BR J HAEMATOL, (2000), vol. 111, pages 608 - 17 | - MIKAELSSON E ET AL., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 105, pages 4828 - 35 | - MIKAELSSON ET AL., BLOOD, (2005), vol. 105, page 4828 | - KOKHAEI P ET AL., EXP HEMATOL, (2007), vol. 35, pages 297 - 304 | - WILLEMS P ET AL., "Belgium-Dutch Hematology-Oncology Group", BLOOD, (2000), vol. 96, pages 63 - 70 | - KOKHAEI ET AL., EXP HEMATOL, (2007), vol. 35, page 297 | - HAY H, J CLIN LAB IMMUNOL, (1989), vol. 29, pages 151 - 5 | - REZVANY MR ET AL., BR J HAEMATOL, (2001), vol. 115, pages 263 - 71 | - DEROSSI ET AL., TRENDS CELL BIOL., (1998), vol. 8, pages 84 - 87 | Opposition | WO2005100605 | WO2007051077 | WO2008076868 | WO2008103849 | WO2010124188 | US2013273073 | - FUKODA et al., "Antisera induced by infusions of autologous Ad-CD154-leukemia B cells identify ROR1 as an oncofetal,antigen and receptor for Wnt5a", PNAS, (20080226), vol. 105, no. 8, pages 3047 - 3052, XP009135222 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0712148105 | - BASKAR et al., "Targeting malignant B cells with an immunotoxin against ROR1", mAbs, (20120500), vol. 4, no. 3, pages 349 - 361, XP002710758 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4161/MABS.19870 | - UniProtKB, (20171220), Database accession no. Q01973, XP055468014 |