EP2512406 - PERFUMES AND PERFUME ENCAPSULATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.07.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.03.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [2012/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DENUTTE, Hugo, Robert Germain Kuipersstraat 12 B-9308 Hofstade (Aalst) / BE | 02 /
CLARE, Jonathan, Richard 77 Grosvenor Avenue Jesmond Newcastle upon Tyne NE2 2NQ / GB | 03 /
MEDINA, Javier 130 Edge Hill Ponteland Newcastle upon Tyne NE20 9JL / GB | 04 /
CUNNINGHAM, Philip, Andrew Stationsstraat 36 B-3080 Vossem / BE | 05 /
SMETS, Johan Bollenberg 79 B-3210 Lubbeek / BE | 06 /
ORLANDINI, Laura Molenheide 6 B-2870 Puurs / BE | [2012/43] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2018/04] | Howard, Phillip Jan, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | ||
Former [2012/43] | Howard, Phillip Jan, et al Procter & Gamble Technical Centres Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 10798886.7 | 16.12.2010 | [2018/04] | WO2010US60662 | Priority number, date | US20090287795P | 18.12.2009 Original published format: US 287795 P | [2012/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011075551 | Date: | 23.06.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2512406 | Date: | 24.10.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.06.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2512406 | Date: | 24.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/11, A61Q13/00, C11D3/50, C11D17/00 | [2016/50] | CPC: |
C11D3/505 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/84 (EP,CN,US);
A61K8/11 (EP,CN,US);
A61Q13/00 (EP,CN,US);
A61Q5/02 (EP,CN,US);
C11D17/0039 (EP,CN,US);
|
Former IPC [2012/43] | A61K8/11, A61Q13/00, C11D3/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/43] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARFUMSTOFFE UND PARFUMSTOFFVERKAPSELUNGEN | [2012/43] | English: | PERFUMES AND PERFUME ENCAPSULATES | [2012/43] | French: | PARFUMS ET ENCAPSULATS DE PARFUMS | [2012/43] | Entry into regional phase | 12.06.2012 | National basic fee paid | 12.06.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 22.01.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.09.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.04.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 27.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.12.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP17204098.2 / EP3309245 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.09.2015 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2018
15.04.2019
WITHDRAWN Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier-Genève / CH Opponent's representative Global Patents Givaudan International SA Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2019/21] |
Former [2018/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.10.2018
WITHDRAWN Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier-Genève / CH Opponent's representative Global Patents Givaudan International SA Ueberlandstrasse 138 8600 Dübendorf / CH | 06.11.2018 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 29.04.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 08.05.2019 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 18.05.2019 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [2019/39] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 27.06.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 27.06.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.07.2016 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.12.2010 | AL | 24.01.2018 | AT | 24.01.2018 | CY | 24.01.2018 | CZ | 24.01.2018 | DK | 24.01.2018 | EE | 24.01.2018 | FI | 24.01.2018 | HR | 24.01.2018 | IT | 24.01.2018 | LT | 24.01.2018 | LV | 24.01.2018 | MC | 24.01.2018 | MK | 24.01.2018 | PL | 24.01.2018 | PT | 24.01.2018 | RO | 24.01.2018 | RS | 24.01.2018 | SE | 24.01.2018 | SI | 24.01.2018 | SK | 24.01.2018 | SM | 24.01.2018 | TR | 24.01.2018 | BG | 24.04.2018 | NO | 24.04.2018 | GR | 25.04.2018 | IS | 24.05.2018 | IE | 16.12.2018 | LU | 16.12.2018 | MT | 16.12.2018 | BE | 31.12.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 16.12.2010 | |
AL | 24.01.2018 | ||
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
PT | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
TR | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
MT | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
BE | 31.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/48] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
IE | 16.12.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
MC | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/39] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
LU | 16.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SI | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
SM | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
DK | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
CZ | 24.01.2018 | ||
EE | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RO | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
SK | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
IT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 24.01.2018 | |
AT | 24.01.2018 | ||
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/40] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
BG | 24.04.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 24.01.2018 | |
CY | 24.01.2018 | ||
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
LV | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
RS | 24.01.2018 | ||
SE | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
IS | 24.05.2018 | ||
Former [2018/37] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
GR | 25.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/36] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
PL | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | CY | 24.01.2018 | |
FI | 24.01.2018 | ||
HR | 24.01.2018 | ||
LT | 24.01.2018 | ||
NO | 24.04.2018 | Cited in | International search | [I]EP0237978 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [I] 1-9 * page 4, line 35 - line 46 *; | [I]WO9836049 (LONZA AG [US], et al) [I] 1-9 * page 24 *; | [X]WO2005103214 (QUEST INT SERV BV [NL], et al) [X] 1-9 * example 14; claim - *; | [I]EP1661973 (SHISEIDO CO LTD [JP]) [I] 1-9 * example 1.1 *; | [I]WO2007034187 (QUEST INT SERV BV [NL], et al) [I] 1-9* example -; claim - * | Examination | EP1407754 | by applicant | US3594328 | US3812011 | US4234627 | US4317881 | US4378923 | US4418144 | US4430243 | US4514461 | US4515705 | US4537706 | US4537707 | US4539135 | US4540721 | US4550862 | US4561998 | US4597898 | USRE32713E | US4882220 | US4911852 | US4917920 | US4968451 | US4973422 | US5486303 | US5489392 | US5506201 | US5516448 | US5552378 | US5565145 | US5565422 | US5569645 | US5574005 | US5576282 | US5595967 | US5597936 | US5651976 | US5691297 | US5858959 | US5879584 | US5929022 | US6024943 | US6042792 | US6048830 | US6051540 | WO0032601 | US6106875 | US6200949 | US6225464 | US6245732 | US6294514 | US6306812 | US6326348 | US6376445 | US6458754 | WO03015736 | US6531444 | US2003125222 | US2003158344 | US2003165692 | US2003195133 | US2003203829 | US6645479 | US2003215417 | US2003216488 | US2004058845 | US2004071742 | US2004071746 | US2004072719 | US2004072720 | US2004087476 | US2004087477 | US2004092414 | US2004091445 | US2004092425 | US2004106536 | US2004110648 | US2005003980 | US6869923 | US2005124530 | US2005130864 | US2005143282 | WO2005102261 | US2005276831 | US2006003913 | US2006039934 | US7119060 | US2006263313 | US2007020263 | US7169741 | US7297674 | Opposition | EP0237978 | WO9812293 | WO9836049 | WO2004016234 | EP1407754 | EP1407753 | WO2005103214 | WO2006018694 | EP1661973 | WO2007034187 | EP1792640 | WO2008016637 | US2008108542 | US2009162408 | - Steffen Arctander, "Perfume and Flavor Chemicals (Aroma Chemicals", Aroma Chemicals, (19940000), XP055525433 | - "TGSC Information System", Manzanate (Givaudan), (20180821), pages 1 - 48, URL: http://www.theqoodscentscompany.com., XP055526010 | - Simon Benita, "Microencapsulation - Methods and Industrial Applications", Drugs and the Pharmaceutical Sciences, (19960000), vol. 73, XP055525440 | - John J. Florio, "Catalysis of Amino Cross-linked Systems", John J. Florio, 00002004, Handbook of Coatings Additives, (20040000), pages 31 - 37, XP055526014 | - "International Cosmetic Ingredient Dictionary and Hand- book", The Cosmetic, Toiletry, and Fra- grance Association (CTFA) , Inc ., (19970000), vol. 3, XP055526016 | - "TGSC Information System", Cyclamen propanal, 18127-01-0, (20180925), pages 1 - 17, URL: http://www.theqoodscentscompany.com., XP055526023 | - "TGSC Information System", 2, 4-ivy carbaldehyde, 68039-49-6, (20180925), pages 1 - 70, URL: http://www.theqoodscentscompanv.com., XP055526073 |