EP2519538 - CYCLOSPORINE ANALOGUES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.08.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2013 | Change or deletion - application deemed withdrawn | published on 04.09.2013 [2013/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Scynexis, Inc. Post Office Box 12878 Research Triangle Park NC 27709-2878 / US | [2012/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OGBU, Cyprian, Okwara Post Office Box 12878 Research Triangle Park NC 27709-2878 / US | 02 /
RICHARDSON, Thomas, Edward Post Office Box 12878 Research Triangle Park NC 27709-2878 / US | [2012/45] | Representative(s) | Jump, Timothy John Simon, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2012/45] | Application number, filing date | 10799265.3 | 30.12.2010 | WO2010US62480 | Priority number, date | US20090290917P | 30.12.2009 Original published format: US 290917 P | [2012/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011082289 | Date: | 07.07.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2519538 | Date: | 07.11.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.07.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.07.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C07K7/64, A61P31/12 | [2012/45] | CPC: |
C07K7/645 (EP,US);
C07K7/64 (KR);
A61K38/13 (KR);
A61P31/12 (EP);
A61P31/14 (EP);
A61K38/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/45] | Title | German: | CYCLOSPORIN-ANALOGA | [2012/45] | English: | CYCLOSPORINE ANALOGUES | [2012/45] | French: | ANALOGUES DE CYCLOSPORINE | [2012/45] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2012 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2012 | Examination requested [2012/45] | 05.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/34] | 05.03.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/36] | 05.03.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2013/36] | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YD]WO9849193 (RHONE POULENC RORER SA [FR], et al) [YD] 1-16 * page 35, line 9 - page 41, line 15; examples 3,6, 7; claims 1,6,8 *; | [YD]US5948884 (LUECHINGER JEAN MARTIN [CH]) [YD] 1-16 * examples 1-3 *; | [YP]WO2010076329 (SCYNEXIS INC [US], et al) [YP] 1-16 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO2007049803 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP], et al) [Y] 1-16 * examples 16, 25, 28, 29, 32, 33, 35, 52, 57, 67-69, 81, 82; claims 1-4,14 *; | [YP]WO2010088573 (ENANTA PHARM INC [US], et al) [YP] 1-16 * claims 1-6, 9 * | by applicant | EP0484281 | US5948755 | US5994299 | US5948884 | US6583265 | WO2006039668 | WO2007041631 | US7196161 | WO9849193 | US5977067 | WO9932512 | WO9967280 | US3845770 | US3916899 | US3536809 | US3598123 | US4008719 | US5674533 | US5059595 | US5591767 | US5120548 | US5073543 | US5639476 | US5354556 | US5639480 | US5733566 | US5739108 | US5891474 | US5922356 | US5972891 | US5980945 | US5993855 | US6045830 | US6087324 | US6113943 | US6197350 | US6248363 | US6264970 | US6267981 | US6376461 | US6419961 | US6589548 | US6613358 | US6699500 | US6630343 | - WATASHI ET AL., HEPATOLOGY, (2003), vol. 38, pages 1282 - 1288 | - NAKAGAWA ET AL., BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (2004), vol. 313, pages 42 - 7 | - AMERICAN JOURNAL OF TRANSPLANTATION, (2004), vol. 4, no. S8, pages 1 - 653 | - CARRY, SYNLETT, (2004), vol. 2, pages 316 - 320 | - RUEGGER ET AL., HELV. CHIM. ACTA., (1976), vol. 59, pages 1075 - 92 | - BOREL ET AL., IMMUNOLOGY, (1977), vol. 32, pages 1017 - 25 | - "Cyclosporins: Recent Developments in Biosynthesis, Pharmacology and Biology, and Clinical Applications", J. KALLEN ET AL., Biotechnology, (1997), pages 535 - 591 | - CAHN ET AL., ANGEW. CHEM., (1966), vol. 78, pages 413 - 447 | - ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED. ENGL., vol. 5, pages 385 - 414 | - ANGEW. CHEM., INT. ED. ENGL., vol. 5, page 511 | - PRELOG; HELMCHEN, ANGEW. CHEM., (1982), vol. 94, pages 614 - 631 | - ANGEW. CHEM. INTERNAT. ED. ENG., vol. 21, pages 567 - 583 | - MATA; LOBO, TETRAHEDRON: ASYMMETRY, (1993), vol. 4, pages 657 - 668 | - JENS T. CARSTENSEN, Drug Stability: Principles & Practice, MARCEL DEKKER, (1995), pages 379 - 80 | - CRC CRIT. REF BIOMED. ENG., (1987), vol. 14, page 201 | - BUCHWALD ET AL., SURGERY, (1980), vol. 88, page 507 | - SAUDEK ET AL., N. ENGL. J. MED., (1989), vol. 321, page 574 | - GOODSON, MEDICAL APPLICATIONS OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, (1984), vol. 2, pages 115 - 138 | - LANGER, SCIENCE, (1990), vol. 249, pages 1527 - 1533 | - SIMMONDS, J GEN VIROL., (2004), vol. 85, pages 3173 - 88 | - SIMMONDS, J. GEN. VIROL., (2001), vol. 82, pages 693 - 712 | - MAIER; WU, WORLD J GASTROENTEROL, (2002), vol. 8, pages 577 - 57 | - LESENS ET AL., J INFECT DIS, (1999), vol. 179, pages 1254 - 1258 | - LINNANEN ET AL., JOURNAL OFMEDICINAL. CHEMISTRY, (2000), vol. 43, page 1339 | - KRIGER, JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (2001), vol. 75, pages 4614 - 4624 | - PIETSCHMANN, JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, (2002), vol. 76, pages 4008 - 4021 | - WEISLOW ET AL., J. NATL. CANCER INST., (1989), vol. 81, pages 577 - 586 | - QUESNIAUX ET AL., EUR. J IMMUNOL., (1987), vol. 17, pages 1359 - 1365 | - BLATTNER ET AL., ANALYTICAL BIOCHEM, (2001), vol. 295, page 220 | US20170612909 |