EP2454042 - POWER TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.06.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Demain Technology PTY Ltd. Unit 2, 11-13 Lakewood Blvd Braeside, VIC 3195 / AU | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DER LINDE, Benjamin Unit 2 11-13 Lakewood Boulevard Braeside, Victoria 3195 / AU | 02 /
CONNOR, Paul Unit 2 11-13 Lakewood Boulevard Braeside, Victoria 3195 / AU | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 10799290.1 | 15.07.2010 | WO2010AU00903 | Priority number, date | AU20090903404 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: AU 2009903404 | [2012/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011006207 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2454042 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23B45/16, B23B45/00, B23B47/14, B25F5/00, F16D7/04 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
B23B45/008 (EP,US);
B25B23/141 (EP,US);
B25F5/001 (EP,US);
F16D7/025 (EP,US);
B23B2260/0445 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | ELEKTROWERKZEUG | [2012/21] | English: | POWER TOOL | [2012/21] | French: | OUTIL À MOTEUR | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2012 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Search fee paid | 19.01.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: AU | 19.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 01.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/28] | 27.02.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2013 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US4710071 (KOEHLER HEINRICH P [US], et al) [X] 1-6,11 * column 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-14 * [A] 9,10,12-15 [I] 7,8; | [XAI]US2008296036 (SIMM ROBERT [CH], et al) [X] 12,13 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-7 * [A] 1-11 [I] 14,15; | [XAI]EP2062694 (BLACK & DECKER INC [US]) [X] 12,13 * paragraph [0001]; figures 1-26 * [A] 1-11 [I] 14,15; | [A]DE3234571 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC WORKS LTD [JP]) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-10 *; | [A]GB2058253 (SCINTILLA AG) [A] 1-15 * page 1, paragraph 1; figures 1-3 * | International search | [X]US4710071 (KOEHLER HEINRICH P [US], et al); | [X]EP1901323 (AREVA T & D SAS [FR]); | [X]US7303026 (FRAUHAMMER KARL [DE], et al); | [Y]US6619149 (FUENFER JOSEF [DE]); | [Y]US6520267 (FUENFER JOSEF [DE], et al); | [A]US6942435 (SCHAIBLE HERMANN [CH], et al); | [A]DE3618024 (HILTI AG [LI]); | [A]US2008169111 (DUESSELBERG ACHIM [CN], et al); | [A]WO2007025323 (DEMAIN TECHNOLOGY PTY TLD [AU], et al); | [A]US7174969 (DROSTE MANFRED [DE]) |