EP2455095 - PROPHYLACTIC, AMELIORATING OR THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ORAL DISEASES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hiroshima University 3-2, Kagamiyama 1-chome Higashi-Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 739-8511 / JP | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NIKAWA, Hiroki c/o GRADUATE SCHOOL OF BIOMEDICAL SCIENCES HIROSHIMA UNIVERSITY 2-3 Kasumi 1-chome Minami-ku Hiroshima-shi Hiroshima 734-8553 / JP | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Weinstrasse 8 80333 München / DE | [2017/23] |
Former [2012/21] | Blodig, Wolfgang Wächtershäuser & Hartz Patentanwaltspartnerschaft Ottostrasse 4 80333 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 10799648.0 | 16.07.2010 | [2017/23] | WO2010JP04626 | Priority number, date | JP20090168122 | 16.07.2009 Original published format: JP 2009168122 | [2012/21] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011007584 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | JA | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2455095 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2455095 | Date: | 07.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/74, A61P1/02 | [2012/21] | CPC: |
A61K35/747 (EP,KR,US);
A23C9/123 (KR,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A23V2400/175 (US);
C12R2001/225 (KR);
C12R2001/245 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Title | German: | PROPHYLAKTISCHER, LINDERNDER ODER THERAPEUTISCHER WIRKSTOFF FÜR ERKRANKUNGEN IM MUNDRAUM | [2012/21] | English: | PROPHYLACTIC, AMELIORATING OR THERAPEUTIC AGENT FOR ORAL DISEASES | [2012/21] | French: | AGENT PROPHYLACTIQUE, D'AMÉLIORATION ET THÉRAPEUTIQUE POUR MALADIES BUCCALES | [2012/21] | Biological material | This application mentions deposited biological material, check the file for details | Entry into regional phase | 20.12.2011 | Translation filed | 20.12.2011 | National basic fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Search fee paid | 20.12.2011 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.12.2011 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2011 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 20.12.2011 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 08.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.09.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.03.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.04.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 27.04.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.04.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.09.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 01.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2010 | AL | 07.06.2017 | AT | 07.06.2017 | CY | 07.06.2017 | CZ | 07.06.2017 | EE | 07.06.2017 | ES | 07.06.2017 | FI | 07.06.2017 | HR | 07.06.2017 | LT | 07.06.2017 | LV | 07.06.2017 | MC | 07.06.2017 | MK | 07.06.2017 | PL | 07.06.2017 | PT | 07.06.2017 | RO | 07.06.2017 | SE | 07.06.2017 | SI | 07.06.2017 | SK | 07.06.2017 | SM | 07.06.2017 | IE | 16.07.2017 | LU | 16.07.2017 | MT | 16.07.2017 | BE | 31.07.2017 | BG | 07.09.2017 | NO | 07.09.2017 | GR | 08.09.2017 | IS | 07.10.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
PT | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.07.2017 | ||
MT | 16.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/52] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
MK | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.07.2017 | ||
MT | 16.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CY | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.07.2017 | ||
MT | 16.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 07.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.07.2017 | ||
MT | 16.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.07.2017 | ||
MT | 16.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.07.2017 | ||
BE | 31.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/34] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.07.2017 | ||
LU | 16.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/23] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SI | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
IE | 16.07.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/18] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
MC | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
PL | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
SM | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
IS | 07.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 07.06.2017 | |
CZ | 07.06.2017 | ||
EE | 07.06.2017 | ||
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
RO | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
SK | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 07.06.2017 | |
ES | 07.06.2017 | ||
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
LV | 07.06.2017 | ||
SE | 07.06.2017 | ||
BG | 07.09.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 07.06.2017 | |
FI | 07.06.2017 | ||
HR | 07.06.2017 | ||
LT | 07.06.2017 | ||
NO | 07.09.2017 | ||
GR | 08.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2009078995 ; | [Y] - KÕLL-KLAIS P ET AL, "Oral lactobacilli in chronic periodontitis and periodontal health: species composition and antimicrobial activity", ORAL MICROBIOLOGY AND IMMUNOLOGY, MUNKSGAARD, COPENHAGEN, DK, (20051201), vol. 20, no. 6, doi:10.1111/J.1399-302X.2005.00239.X, ISSN 0902-0055, pages 354 - 361, XP009166559 [Y] 1-8 *cf. summary at page 354, page 355, paras. 2-4 of the left-sided col., page 356, 2nd para. at the right col., page 360, 2nd and 3rd paras. of the middle part* DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1399-302X.2005.00239.x | [Y] - SMITH S I ET AL, "Lactobacilli in human dental caries and saliva", MICROBIOS, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20010101), vol. 105, no. 411, ISSN 0026-2633, pages 77 - 85, XP009138831 [Y] 1-8 *cf. abstract, last para. of page 84* | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2009, no. 30, Database accession no. 2009-H31581, XP002691122 & JP2009078995 A 20090416 (UNIV NIPPON) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [X] - AYA HIYAMA ET AL., "Koku Yurai Nyusankinkabu ni yoru mutans strepococci Oyobi Candida no Soshi Sayo", HIROSHIMA DAIGAKU SHIGAKU ZASSHI, (200906), vol. 41, no. 1, pages 93 - 94, XP008158817 | by applicant | WO0216554 | WO03082027 | JP2003299480 | JP2008502360 | JP2008037859 | JP2008237198 | - SUMIYO MIMURA; HIROKI NIKAWA; SEICHO MAKIHIRA; AYA HIYAMA; YUKO TAKAMOTO, THE JOURNAL OF NIPPON ACADEMY OF DENTAL TECHNOLOGY, (2008), vol. 29, page 298 | - NIKAWA, H.; NISHIMURA, H.; YAMAMOTO, T.; HAMADA, T.; SAMARANAYAKE, L. P., "The role of saliva and serum in Candida albicans biofilm formation on denture acrylic surfaces", MICROBIAL ECOL HEALTH & DIS, (1996), vol. 9, pages 35 - 48 |