EP2455079 - COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF BONE DISEASES COMPRISING COLFORSIN DAROPATE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Bioscience and Biotechnology 52, Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-333 / KR | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Chemical Technology 100, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-343 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/21] | For all designated states Korea Research Institute of Bioscience and Biotechnology 52, Eoeun-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-333 / KR | ||
For all designated states Korea Research Institute Of Chemical Technology 100, Jang-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon 305-343 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KWON, Byoung-Mog 52, Eoeun-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-806 / KR | 02 /
HAN, Dong Cho 52, Eoeun-dong, Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-806 / KR | 03 /
BAE, Myung Ae 101-401 Jangdae Purgio Apt. Jangdae-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-308 / KR | 04 /
KIM, Seong Hwan 101-801 Daelim Dure Apt. Sinseong-dong Yuseong-gu Daejeon 305-720 / KR | 05 /
MIN, Yong Ki 109-804 Nuri Apt. Wolpyeong-dong Seo-gu Daejeon 302-280 / KR | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Kador, Utz Ulrich Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15 80469 München / DE | [2012/21] | Application number, filing date | 10800063.9 | 16.07.2010 | WO2010KR04672 | Priority number, date | KR20090065505 | 17.07.2009 Original published format: KR 20090065505 | [2012/21] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2011008052 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | KO | [2011/03] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2455079 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2455079 | Date: | 18.03.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 19.05.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.12.2012 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/352, A61P19/10, A61P19/02, A23L1/30, A61P19/08, A61K31/35 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
A61K31/352 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/35 (KR,US);
A23L33/10 (EP,KR,US);
A61P1/02 (EP);
A61P19/02 (EP);
A61P19/08 (EP);
A61P19/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P35/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/03] | A61K31/352, A61P19/10, A61P19/02, A23L1/30, A61P19/08 | ||
Former IPC [2012/21] | A61K31/352, A61P19/10, A61P19/02, A23L1/30 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNG ZUR PRÄVENTION ODER BEHANDLUNG VON KNOCHENERKRANKUNGEN MIT COLFORSIN-DAROPAT | [2012/21] | English: | COMPOSITION FOR THE PREVENTION OR TREATMENT OF BONE DISEASES COMPRISING COLFORSIN DAROPATE | [2012/21] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR LA PRÉVENTION OU LE TRAITEMENT DE MALADIES OSSEUSES COMPRENANT DU DAROPATE DE COLFORSINE | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2012 | Translation filed | 07.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 07.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 04.07.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.02.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 21.12.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 16.07.2010 | AL | 18.03.2015 | AT | 18.03.2015 | BE | 18.03.2015 | BG | 18.03.2015 | CY | 18.03.2015 | CZ | 18.03.2015 | DK | 18.03.2015 | EE | 18.03.2015 | ES | 18.03.2015 | FI | 18.03.2015 | HR | 18.03.2015 | LT | 18.03.2015 | LV | 18.03.2015 | MC | 18.03.2015 | MK | 18.03.2015 | MT | 18.03.2015 | NL | 18.03.2015 | PL | 18.03.2015 | RO | 18.03.2015 | SE | 18.03.2015 | SI | 18.03.2015 | SK | 18.03.2015 | SM | 18.03.2015 | TR | 18.03.2015 | NO | 18.06.2015 | GR | 19.06.2015 | IE | 16.07.2015 | LU | 16.07.2015 | IS | 18.07.2015 | PT | 20.07.2015 | CH | 31.07.2015 | LI | 31.07.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/30] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MK | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.07.2015 | ||
LU | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/38] | HU | 16.07.2010 | |
AT | 18.03.2015 | ||
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
BG | 18.03.2015 | ||
CY | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
SM | 18.03.2015 | ||
TR | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.07.2015 | ||
LU | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2017/21] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
MT | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.07.2015 | ||
LU | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
BE | 18.03.2015 | ||
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.07.2015 | ||
LU | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/33] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IE | 16.07.2015 | ||
LU | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
CH | 31.07.2015 | ||
LI | 31.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/15] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
LU | 16.07.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/13] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
MC | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SI | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
DK | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 18.03.2015 | |
CZ | 18.03.2015 | ||
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
PL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
IS | 18.07.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 18.03.2015 | |
EE | 18.03.2015 | ||
ES | 18.03.2015 | ||
FI | 18.03.2015 | ||
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
RO | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
SK | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
PT | 20.07.2015 | ||
Former [2015/41] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
NL | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
LV | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
GR | 19.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | FI | 18.03.2015 | |
HR | 18.03.2015 | ||
LT | 18.03.2015 | ||
SE | 18.03.2015 | ||
NO | 18.06.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | LT | 18.03.2015 | |
NO | 18.06.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0448029 (NIPPON KAYAKU KK [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * page 3, lines 5-27 * * page 3, line 39 - page 4, line 5 *; | [Y]WO0021523 (MERCK & CO INC [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, lines 9-18 * * page 3, lines 23-25, 33-34 * * page 7, lines 12-19 * * page 12, lines 14-15, 26-27 * * page 21, lines 12-16 * * claims 1, 5, 7 *; | [Y]JP2007210988 | [Y] - HAKEDA Y ET AL, "Induction of osteoblastic cell differentiation by forskolin. Stimulation of cyclic AMP production and alkaline phosphatase activity", BIOCHIMICA ET BIOPHYSICA ACTA - GENERAL SUBJECTS, ELSEVIER SCIENCE PUBLISHERS, NL, vol. 838, no. 1, doi:10.1016/0304-4165(85)90248-X, ISSN 0304-4165, (19850128), pages 49 - 53, (19850128), XP025786513 [Y] 1-8 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0304-4165(85)90248-X | [Y] - LERNER U H ET AL, "Comparison between the effects of forskolin and calcitonin on bone resorption and osteoclast morphology in vitro", BONE, PERGAMON PRESS., OXFORD, GB, vol. 10, no. 5, ISSN 8756-3282, (19890101), pages 377 - 387, (19890101), XP026432373 [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | [Y] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, no. 73, Database accession no. 2007-780850, XP002689064 & JP2007210988 A 20070823 (SABINSA CORP) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * | International search | [A]WO2008141189 (ELIXIR PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [A] - HIBINO, N. ET AL., "Cardiovascular effects of colforsin daropate hydro-chloride for acute heart failure after open heart surgery", KYOBU GEKA, (200111), vol. 54, no. 12, pages 1016 - 1019, XP008151389 | [A] - NOBUHIKO, HAYASHIDA ET AL., "Antiinflammatory effects of colforsin daropate hydrochloride, a novel water-soluble forskolin derivative", ANN THORAC SURG, (2001), vol. 71, pages 1931 - 1938, XP008151378 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0003-4975(01)02531-0 | [A] - MASAYOSHI, UCHIDA ET AL., "Both Milrinone and Colforsin Daropate Attenuate the Sustained Pial Arteriolar Constriction Seen After Unclamping of an Abdo-minal Aortic Cross-Clamp in Rabbits", ANESTH ANALG, (2005), vol. 101, pages 9 - 16, XP008151379 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1213/01.ANE.0000158610.76898.5C | by applicant | - LEE ZH; KIM HH, "Signal transduction by receptor activator of nuclear factor kappa B in osteoclasts", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (20030530), vol. 305, doi:doi:10.1016/S0006-291X(03)00695-8, pages 211 - 4, XP002994025 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0006-291X(03)00695-8 | - PITTENGER, M. F.; MACKAY, A. M.; BECK, S. C.; JAISWAL, R. K.; DOUGLAS, R.; MOSCA, J. D.; MOORMAN, M. A.; SIMMONETTI, D. W.; CRAIG,, "Multilineage Potential of Adult Human Mesenchymal Stem Cells", SCIENCE, (1999), vol. 284, doi:doi:10.1126/science.284.5411.143, pages 143 - 147, XP002942313 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.284.5411.143 | - SHAN Y ET AL., CHEM PHARM BULL, (2007), vol. 55, pages 376 - 81 | - TATEE T ET AL., CHEM PHARM BULL, (1996), vol. 44, pages 2274 - 9 |