EP2454488 - HYDRAULIC PRESSURE TRANSDUCER AND HYDRAULIC SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.04.2019 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Exencotech Ab Djupdalsvägen 7 19251 Sollentuna / SE | [2012/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ÖSTLUND, Bengt Svampvägen 14 S-192 51 Sollentuna / SE | 02 /
SVENSSON, Assar Borgvägen 42 S-192 55 Sollentuna / SE | 03 /
INGVAST, Håkan Sågudden 21 S-894 31 Själevad / SE | [2012/21] | Representative(s) | Groth & Co. KB P.O. Box 6107 102 32 Stockholm / SE | [2014/26] |
Former [2012/21] | Melin Granberg, Linda Groth & Co KB P.O. Box 6107 S-102 32 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 10800114.0 | 12.07.2010 | [2018/22] | WO2010SE50810 | Priority number, date | SE20090050555 | 14.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0950555 | SE20090050556 | 14.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0950556 | SE20090050557 | 14.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0950557 | SE20090050558 | 14.07.2009 Original published format: SE 0950558 | US20090225220P | 14.07.2009 Original published format: US 225220 P | US20090225222P | 14.07.2009 Original published format: US 225222 P | US20090225223P | 14.07.2009 Original published format: US 225223 P | US20090225224P | 14.07.2009 Original published format: US 225224 P | [2012/50] |
Former [2012/21] | SE20090050555 | 14.07.2009 | |
SE20090050556 | 14.07.2009 | ||
SE20090050557 | 14.07.2009 | ||
SE20090050558 | 14.07.2009 | ||
US20090225220 | 14.07.2009 | ||
US20090225222 | 14.07.2009 | ||
US20090225223 | 14.07.2009 | ||
US20090225224 | 14.07.2009 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2011008158 | Date: | 20.01.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/03] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2454488 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.01.2011 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2012/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2454488 | Date: | 30.05.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 20.01.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.05.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F03G7/06, F03G7/05, F04F13/00, F15B3/00 | [2017/22] | CPC: |
F04F13/00 (EP,US);
F03G7/05 (EP,US);
F03G7/06 (EP,US);
F15B3/00 (EP,US);
Y02E10/30 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2012/21] | F04F13/00, F15B3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2012/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HYDRAULIKDRUCKWANDLER UND HYDRAULIKSYSTEM | [2012/21] | English: | HYDRAULIC PRESSURE TRANSDUCER AND HYDRAULIC SYSTEM | [2012/21] | French: | TRANSDUCTEUR DE PRESSION HYDRAULIQUE, ET SYSTÈME HYDRAULIQUE | [2012/21] | Entry into regional phase | 14.02.2012 | National basic fee paid | 14.02.2012 | Search fee paid | 14.02.2012 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.02.2012 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.02.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2012 | Examination requested [2012/21] | 18.12.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.04.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 18.04.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.04.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.12.2017 | Opposition(s) | 01.03.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.07.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.07.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.07.2010 | AL | 30.05.2018 | AT | 30.05.2018 | CY | 30.05.2018 | CZ | 30.05.2018 | DK | 30.05.2018 | EE | 30.05.2018 | ES | 30.05.2018 | FI | 30.05.2018 | HR | 30.05.2018 | LT | 30.05.2018 | LV | 30.05.2018 | MC | 30.05.2018 | MK | 30.05.2018 | NL | 30.05.2018 | PL | 30.05.2018 | PT | 30.05.2018 | RO | 30.05.2018 | SI | 30.05.2018 | SK | 30.05.2018 | SM | 30.05.2018 | TR | 30.05.2018 | IE | 12.07.2018 | LU | 12.07.2018 | MT | 12.07.2018 | CH | 31.07.2018 | LI | 31.07.2018 | BG | 30.08.2018 | NO | 30.08.2018 | GR | 31.08.2018 | IS | 30.09.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 12.07.2010 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
MK | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
MT | 12.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | HU | 12.07.2010 | |
AL | 30.05.2018 | ||
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PT | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
MT | 12.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
TR | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
MT | 12.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
MT | 12.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/51] | AL | 30.05.2018 | |
AT | 30.05.2018 | ||
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SI | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
CH | 31.07.2018 | ||
LI | 31.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/19] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
IE | 12.07.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
LU | 12.07.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
MC | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/11] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
SM | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 30.05.2018 | |
CY | 30.05.2018 | ||
CZ | 30.05.2018 | ||
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
PL | 30.05.2018 | ||
RO | 30.05.2018 | ||
SK | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
EE | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
DK | 30.05.2018 | ||
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
NL | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
GR | 31.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
LV | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | CY | 30.05.2018 | |
ES | 30.05.2018 | ||
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
HR | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
BG | 30.08.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | ES | 30.05.2018 | |
FI | 30.05.2018 | ||
LT | 30.05.2018 | ||
NO | 30.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4079596 (CHENG CHEN-YEN, et al) [A] 1-8 * column 4, line 26 - column 7, line 29; figures 1-7b *; | [A]US6497558 (HALE DAVID C [US]) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 46 - column 4, line 37; figure 1 *; | [A]US2006037895 (SHUMWAY SCOTT [US]) [A] 1-8* paragraphs [0001] , [0020] - [0034]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2008245068 (BASTAWROS ASHRAF F [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0002] , [0019] , [0044] , [0045]; figures 4,5 *; | [A]US2009013691 (JONES JACK A [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0003] , [0021] - [0029]; figures 4,5 * | International search | [A]US3431747 (HASHEMI HADI T, et al); | [A]US4973408 (KEEFER BOWIE G [CA]); | [A]US5117908 (HOFMANN HEINRICH [DE]); | [A]US2006037895 (SHUMWAY SCOTT [US]); | [A]JP2008039024 (HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES LTD); | [A]US2008190848 (OKLEJAS ELI [US]); | [A]WO2009072894 (EUREKA GRUPPEN AS [NO], et al) |